New Jersey District Court
Judge:Renee Marie Bumb
Referred: Sharon A King
Case #: 1:24-cv-09882
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
THE CAMPBELL'S COMPANY
Represented By
JAMES W. MCGARRY
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Notice Only
PHV JAMES O. FLECKNER
Notice Only
PHV ISABEL MARIN
Plaintiff
JAMAR SPENCER
Represented By
LISA R. CONSIDINE
Siri & Glimstad LLP
contact info
DAVID J DISABATO
Siri Glimstad LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
38 38 respoth Response (NOT Motion) Wed 04/23 11:27 AM
RESPONSE re37 Notice (Other). (MCGARRY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
37 37 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/21 12:33 PM
NOTICE by JAMAR SPENCER re32 MOTION to Dismiss of Supplemental Authority(CONSIDINE, LISA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Order
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
36 36 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 03/25 3:44 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by THE CAMPBELL'S COMPANY re32 MOTION to Dismiss (MCGARRY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
35 35 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Fri 03/14 10:33 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Isabel Marin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-16088940.) (MCGARRY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Fri 03/14 10:30 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice James O. Fleckner to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-16088925.) (MCGARRY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Mon 03/17 8:12 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, JAMES O. FLECKNER and ISABEL MARIN, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (js)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
33 33 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Tue 03/11 9:41 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by JAMAR SPENCER re32 MOTION to Dismiss (CONSIDINE, LISA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
32 32 motion Dismiss Tue 02/11 4:25 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by THE CAMPBELL'S COMPANY.(MCGARRY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/13 10:50 AM
Set Deadlines as to32 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 3/17/2025 before Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Fri 01/31 4:18 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee as to ISABEL M. MARIN, Esq $ 250, receipt number CAM15304 (kes, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
31 31 misc Transcript Tue 01/21 2:23 PM
Transcript of Pre-Motion Conference via Teams videoconferencing held on 1/7/2025, before Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Court Reporter: John Kurz (856-576-7094). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 2/11/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/21/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2025. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/15 2:22 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Isabel M. Marin, Esquire. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 01/15/2025. (aji, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
29 29 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 01/08 6:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CAMPBELL'S COMPANY. (MCGARRY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
28 28 order Order Tue 01/07 3:51 PM
TEXT ORDER Having reviewed the parties' pre-motion letters [Docket Nos. 17, 21] and having held a pre-motion conference on January 7, 2025, with the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that the parties shall comply with the following briefing schedule: Defendant shall file its motion to dismiss, if it so chooses, by Tuesday, February 11, 2025; Plaintiff shall file any opposition by Tuesday, March 11, 2025; and Defendant shall file any reply by Tuesday, March 25, 2025. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 01/07/2025. (Costigan, Roberta)
Related: [-]
27 27 minutes Status Conference Tue 01/07 2:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb: Pre-Motion Conference held via Teams Video on 1/7/2025. Ordered defendant to file a Motion to Dismiss by 2/11/25, plaintiff to file any opposition by 3/11/25 and any reply to be filed by 3/25/25. (Court Reporter, John Kurz (856-576-7094)) (ar1, )
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/07 12:07 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Oren Faircloth). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 1/7/25. (mb, )
Related: [-]
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/07 12:06 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Scott Haskins). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 1/7/25. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/03 2:16 PM
Set Deadlines as to24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 2/3/2025 before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
24 24 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/02 1:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by THE CAMPBELL'S COMPANY.(MCGARRY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Isabel M. Marin, Esq.,
Att: 2 Certification of James W. McGarry, Esq.,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
23 23 order Order Tue 12/17 1:38 PM
TEXT ORDER This matter comes before the Court upon letters from Defendant The Campbell's Company and Plaintiff Jamar Spencer [Docket Nos. 17, 21], concerning a proposed motion to dismiss by Defendant. Having read those letters, the Court will hold a pre-motion conference via Teams on Tuesday, January 7, 2025, at 2:00 p.m., unless Defendant advises the Court before then that the issues raised in Plaintiff's letter resolve its concerns. The Court will send the Teams link to Counsels' email addresses as they appear on the docket. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/17/2024. (Costigan, Roberta)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Mon 12/16 12:18 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee received as to JAIME A. SANTOS and JAMES O. FLCECKNER: $ 500, receipt number TRE141703. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
22 22 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/11 8:21 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JAMAR SPENCER.(CONSIDINE, LISA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification OF OREN FAIRCLOTH,
Att: 2 Certification OF LISA CONSIDINE,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
21 21 misc Letter Wed 12/11 3:43 PM
Letter from Lisa Considine o/b/o Plaintiff Jamar Spencer in opposition to re17 Letter. (CONSIDINE, LISA)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/12 8:33 AM
Set Deadlines as to22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 1/6/2025 before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
20 20 order Stipulation and Order Wed 12/11 11:31 AM
STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S NAME CHANGE: The caption and case file information shall be modified to reflect Defendant's new name, The Campbell's Company; Defendant the Campbell's Company shall file an updated corporate disclosure statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 12/10/2024. (sms2)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Certification in Support of Motion Tue 12/10 8:10 PM
CERTIFICATION in Support filed by JAMAR SPENCER re18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CONSIDINE, LISA)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/09 9:58 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JAMAR SPENCER.(CONSIDINE, LISA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Lisa Considine in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Certification Certification of S. Haskins in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
qc QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney Mon 12/09 4:03 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certification of Scott Haskins submitted by Lisa R. Considine on 12/9/2024 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER SCANNED SIGNATURE using the "Certification" event found under Responses and Replies. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/09 4:10 PM
Set Deadlines as to18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 1/6/2025 before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
17 17 misc Letter Wed 12/04 3:54 PM
Letter from James M. McGarry Requesting Pre-Motion Conference. (MCGARRY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation Tue 12/03 3:01 PM
STIPULATION and Consent Order Regarding Defendant's Name Change by CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY. (FLECKNER, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/27 11:06 AM
ORDER, Granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jaime A. Santos, Esq.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 11/27/2024. (js)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/27 10:58 AM
ORDER, Granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (James O. Fleckner, Esq.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 11/27/2024. (js)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order Thu 11/14 2:32 PM
LETTER ORDER Granting Defendant's12 request for an extension to file a pre-motion conference letter on or before December 4, 2024. Signed by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 11/14/2024. (sms2)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic Message Thu 11/14 1:29 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Clerk's note: The Text Order that was entered erroneously in this case at document 13 on the docket, filed on 11/14/2024 has been deleted at the direction of the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
12 12 misc Letter Wed 11/13 6:20 PM
Letter from James W. McGarry Regarding Extension of Time to Respond re1 Complaint. (MCGARRY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/12 9:41 AM
Set Deadlines as to11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ,10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 12/2/2024 before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/08 6:54 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY.(MCGARRY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Jaime A. Santos, Esq.,
Att: 2 Certification of James W. McGarry, Esq.,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/08 6:54 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY.(MCGARRY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of James O. Fleckner, Esq.,
Att: 2 Certification of James W. McGarry, Esq.,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
9 9 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Fri 11/08 3:29 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint.. (MCGARRY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Fri 11/08 9:29 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Application for a Clerk's Extension8 filed by James W. McGarry on 11/7/2024 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT using "Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order" found under Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 11/08 5:08 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The9 Application for a Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer submitted by CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY on 11/8/2024 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/26/2024. (mag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 11/07 4:56 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond per L.R. 6.1 by CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY.(MCGARRY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 11/07 4:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY. (MCGARRY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/07 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES W. MCGARRY on behalf of CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY (MCGARRY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/04 1:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LISA R. CONSIDINE on behalf of JAMAR SPENCER (CONSIDINE, LISA) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/4/2024) (sms2)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Fillable PDF Mon 11/04 2:28 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The5 Notice of Appearance filed by LISA R. CONSIDINE on 11/4/2024 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/25 11:11 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMAR SPENCER. CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY served on 10/21/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (DISABATO, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
qc QC - Fillable PDF Tue 10/22 8:34 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Civil Cover Sheet 1-1 filed by David J. Disabato on 10/17/2024 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (tf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 10/18 9:35 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dmr)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Fri 10/18 9:35 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 10/17 2:51 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by JAMAR SPENCER. (DISABATO, DAVID)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/17 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT against CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15745154), filed by JAMAR SPENCER.(DISABATO, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 10/17 4:43 PM
Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (mmb)
Related: [-]