New Jersey District Court
Judge:Brian R Martinotti
Referred: Michael A Hammer
Case #: 2:24-cv-09883
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2024
Terminated:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 4:39 AM EDT
Defendant
LOGISTICS ENTERPRISE INC
Plaintiff
IHSAN N. BARRETT
Represented By
ROBERT D. SALAMAN
Akin Law Group PLLC
contact info

GPO Apr 22 2025
DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 4/22/2025. (mxw, )

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 04/22 5:05 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 4/22/2025. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 04/22 5:07 PM
Set Hearings: Proof Hearing pursuant to12 DEFAULT JUDGMENT set for 6/16/2025 at 01:30 PM in Newark - PO Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/10 9:43 AM
Set Deadlines as to11 MOTION for Default Judgment. Motion set for 4/7/2025 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (adc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
11 11 motion Default Judgment Fri 03/07 4:13 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant by IHSAN N. BARRETT.(SALAMAN, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - AOS,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Order,
Att: 6 Exhibit D - Atty Billing Records,
Att: 7 Exhibit E - Proposed Default Order
Monday, February 10, 2025
order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 02/10 9:18 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to LOGISTICS ENTERPRISE INC for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (ld)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order Fri 02/07 4:04 PM
LETTER ORDER granting9 Plaintiff's Request that the Court extend the deadline for Plaintiff to file a Motion for Default Judgment by thirty (30) days to 3/7/2025. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 2/7/2025. (dam)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Letter Fri 02/07 2:06 PM
Letter from Robert Salaman for extension of time to file default motion re 7 Text Order,,. (SALAMAN, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 02/07 2:05 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default by IHSAN N. BARRETT against Logistics Enterprise Inc.(SALAMAN, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Monday, January 27, 2025
7 7 order Text Order Mon 01/27 12:51 PM
TEXT ORDER: Our records indicate that proof of service has been filed in this civil action and that the time for defendant to answer has expired. You are hereby directed to move this civil action by requesting that a default and default judgment be entered or submitting an extension to Answer out of time within fourteen (14) days from the date hereof. Should you fail to do so, this action shall be listed for dismissal on February 10, 2025, at 9:00 am. SO ORDERED by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 01/27/2025. (lr, )
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/27 12:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by IHSAN N. BARRETT. LOGISTICS ENTERPRISE INC served on 11/20/2024, answer due 12/11/2024. (SALAMAN, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Call for Dismissal Mon 01/27 10:17 AM
Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). Motion set for 2/10/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. (lr, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 10/21 2:02 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against LOGISTICS ENTERPRISE INC, filed by IHSAN N. BARRETT.(SALAMAN, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 10/18 4:26 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to LOGISTICS ENTERPRISE INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
Related: [-]
2 2 order Text Order Fri 10/18 3:53 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of and has reviewed the1 Complaint. The Complaint fails to sufficiently set forth plaintiff's citizenship. Rather, it only references "residency." Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by October 25, 2024, sufficiently stating the basis for this Court's jurisdiction.So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/18/2024. (lr, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/17 2:50 PM
COMPLAINT against LOGISTICS ENTERPRISE INC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15745193) with JURY DEMAND, filed by IHSAN N. BARRETT.(SALAMAN, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 10/17 4:00 PM
Case assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
Related: [-]