Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Referred: Dustin M Howell
Case #: 1:24-cv-01244
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2024
Terminated:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 3:44 AM CDT
Defendant
Terri L Mayer
Plaintiff
Quincy Danell Punch
9229 Hillis St.
Houston, TX 77028

GPO Mar 04 2025
ORDER GRANTING 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (cc3)
GPO Apr 29 2025
ORDER ADOPTING 6 Report and Recommendations and DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
12 12 misc Certified Mail Receipt Thu 05/15 4:21 PM
Certified Mail RETURN Receipt as to QUINCY DANELL PUNCH of9 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and10 Judgment (cc3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
11 11 misc Certified Mail Receipt Wed 04/30 4:23 PM
Certified Mail Receipt as to QUINCY DANELL PUNCH of9 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and10 Final Judgment (cc3)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Judgment Wed 04/30 3:15 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
9 9 2 pgs order Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations Wed 04/30 3:14 PM
ORDER ADOPTING6 Report and Recommendations and DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
8 8 misc Certified Mail Receipt Mon 03/24 8:20 AM
Certified Mail RETURN Receipt as to QUINCY DANELL PUNCH of6 Order & Report and Recommendations (cc3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
7 7 misc Certified Mail Receipt Wed 03/05 9:02 AM
Certified Mail Receipt as to QUINCY DANELL PUNCH of6 Order and Report and Recommendations (cc3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
6 6 misc Report and Recommendations ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 03/05 8:25 AM
ORDER GRANTING2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (cc3)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Wed 03/05 8:26 AM
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dustin M. Howell. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 02/05 1:08 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert Pitman for all proceedings. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
4 4 misc Supplement to Wed 10/30 12:38 PM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Complaint by Quincy Danell Punch. (cr5)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 10/17 3:01 PM
STANDING ORDER (dated 05/11/2023) REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin M. Howell. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Dustin M. Howell. (cr5)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 10/17 2:57 PM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Quincy Danell Punch. (cr5)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/17 2:43 PM
COMPLAINT (IFP PENDING), filed by Quincy Danell Punch.(cr5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 10/17 2:46 PM
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cr5)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Thu 10/17 2:47 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell. (cr5)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Thu 10/17 2:50 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Quincy Danell Punch. (cr5)
Related: [-]