Mississippi Northern District Court
Judge:Michael P Mills
Referred: Jane M Virden
Case #: 3:24-cv-00326
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 4:01 AM CDT
Defendant
Warrior Transportation & Logistics, LLC
Represented By
Nakimuli O. Davis-Primer
Baker, Donelson, Bearman & Caldwell - Jackson
contact info
Plaintiff
Candace Washington
Represented By
Robert N. Norris
Watson & Norris, PLLC
contact info
Jane Ashley Watson
Watson & Norris PLLC
contact info
Louis H Watson, Jr
Louis H. Watson, Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Service Tue 04/29 7:15 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Requests for Admissions by Robert N. Norris on behalf of Candace Washington to Defendant. (Norris, Robert)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Service Tue 04/29 7:14 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Requests for Production by Robert N. Norris on behalf of Candace Washington to Defendant. (Norris, Robert)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Service Tue 04/29 7:13 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories by Robert N. Norris on behalf of Candace Washington to Defendant. (Norris, Robert)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Service Tue 04/29 7:11 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pre-Discovery Disclosures by Robert N. Norris on behalf of Candace Washington to Defendant. (Norris, Robert)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Case Management Order Tue 04/29 4:08 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2026 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 10/29/2025. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 6/12/2025. Plaintiff's Designation of Experts due by 7/29/2025. Defendant's Designation of Experts due by 8/29/2025. Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 12/1/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/29/2025. (bbf)
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Case Management Conference Tue 04/29 2:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 4/29/2025. (bbf)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Service Mon 04/28 3:09 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Nakimuli O. Davis-Primer on behalf of Warrior Transportation & Logistics, LLC to Plaintiff Candace Washington via Counsel of Record. (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Correction Mon 04/28 2:59 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Chad Eisenback: Attorney directed to file a certificate of good standing from Kentucky and Tennessee licensing authority as required by L.U.Civ.R. 83.1 (d)(4). Please use the civil event "Exhibits to Other Document" and link to the original motion. (jla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/23 7:13 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Chad Eisenback,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2521243) by Candace Washington. (Norris, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Good Faith Certificate
notice Notice of Correction Wed 04/23 11:48 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Chad Eisenback: Attorney directed to file a certificate of good standing from Illinois licensing authority as required by L.U.Civ.R. 83.1 (d)(4). Please use the civil event "Exhibits to Other Document" and link to the original motion. (jla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
15 15 order Initial Order - Rule 16.1 Tue 04/01 3:57 PM
INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2025 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and proposed case management order due to the magistrate judge no later than 4/15/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/1/2025. (bbf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 03/27 4:31 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Warrior Transportation & Logistics, LLC . (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/27 3:48 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Warrior Transportation & Logistics, LLC. (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 03/27 12:23 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nakimuli O. Davis-Primer on behalf of Warrior Transportation & Logistics, LLC (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/10 3:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louis H Watson, Jr on behalf of Candace Washington Candace Washington served on 3/6/2025. (Watson, Louis)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/10 2:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Candace Washington served on 3/6/2024. (Watson, Louis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 02/11 9:22 AM
ORDER granting7 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve the Complaint. Plaintiff shall have through April 11, 2025, to serve her complaint upon the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/11/2025. (bbf)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
8 8 misc Affidavit Mon 02/10 11:59 AM
AFFIDAVIT re7 MOTION for Extension of Time To Serve Complaint . (Norris, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time Mon 02/10 10:13 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time To Serve Complaint by Candace Washington. (Norris, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit Mazianio Reliford
Monday, January 27, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 01/27 11:35 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/27/2025. (jla)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
notice Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process/Past Due Answer Fri 01/24 12:50 PM
CLERK'S THIRD NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Warrior Transportation & Logistics, LLC (zdg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
notice Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process/Past Due Answer Thu 12/19 5:26 PM
CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Warrior Transportation & Logistics, LLC (jla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
5 5 service Summons Reissued Tue 11/19 11:05 AM
Summons Reissued as to Warrior Transportation & Logistics, LLC. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (jla)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
notice Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process/Past Due Answer Mon 11/18 8:43 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Warrior Transportation and Logistics, LLC (jla)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 10/18 8:32 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jane Ashley Watson on behalf of Candace Washington (Watson, Jane)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 10/18 8:29 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert N. Norris on behalf of Candace Washington (Norris, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 10/17 5:37 PM
Summons Issued as to Warrior Transportation & Logistics, LLC. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (jla)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/17 5:36 PM
COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMSNDC-2450375, filed by Candace Washington. (jla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Assignment Thu 10/17 5:37 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
Related: [-]