New York Southern District Court
Judge:Laura Taylor Swain
Case #: 1:24-cv-07851
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 6:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Archdiocese of New York
Defendant
Yale University
Defendant
United Nations
Defendant
Donald Trump
Defendant
The Pentagon
Defendant
Tampa Central Command MacDill Air Force Base
Defendant
Sarasota County Commission
Defendant
Donna Marie Padar
Defendant
New York City Port Authority
Defendant
New York City Police Department (NYPD)
Defendant
New York City Department of Environmental of Protection (NYDEP)
Defendant
Elon Musk
Defendant
Mayor Eric Adams
Defendant
Lawrence D. Fink Black Rock Investment Group, LLC
Defendant
Harvard University
Defendant
Nikky Haley
Defendant
Greenberg Traurig Law
Defendant
Bill Gates
Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Defendant
Ron DeSantis
Defendant
City Counsel of New York City
Defendant
Dick Cheney
Defendant
Central Intelligence Agency (CIA)
Defendant
Jeb Bush
Defendant
George W. Bush
Defendant
Boca Raton ADL
Defendant
Joe Biden
Defendant
Obama Barrack
Defendant
Archdiocese of Miami
Plaintiff
Joseph D Gilberti
#2024-2237 Sarasota County Correctional Facility 2020 Main Street
Sarasota, FL 34231


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/14 6:35 PM
NOTICE of Related Cases. Document filed by Joseph D Gilberti. (ar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/21 11:23 AM
TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF FLORIDA SUPREME COURT MANDAMUS. Document filed by Joseph D Gilberti. (tro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
12 12 motion Stay Wed 03/05 6:07 PM
MOTION to Stay. Document filed by Joseph D Gilberti..(ks)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
11 11 3 pgs order Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case Mon 02/24 9:38 AM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. A prisoner bringing a civil action is required to pay the full $350 filing fee even when proceeding in forma pauperis (IFP), that is, without prepayment of fees.... The Court must collect, when funds exist in a prisoner's account, an initial partial filing fee plus monthly payments.... Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of the Plaintiff.... The Clerk of the Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket.... (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/24/2025) (sac)
Related: [-]
misc Mailing Receipt Mon 02/24 9:39 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 11. Mailed to: Joseph D Gilberti #2024-2237 Sarasota County Correctional Facility 2020 Main Street Sarasota, FL 34231. (sac)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
10 10 service Certificate of Service Other Fri 01/10 1:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Joseph D Gilberti..(kgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time Thu 11/21 12:08 PM
Request for 90-day Extension to serve defendants and Clerk to Sign Attached Summons addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Joseph D. Gilberti dated 11/19/2024. (tp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
8 8 misc Prisoner Authorization Fri 11/15 2:43 PM
PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Joseph D Gilberti. (ar)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 11/15 2:39 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Joseph D Gilberti.(ar)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/08 9:22 AM
Notice of Fraud Transfer by Sarasota County Commission, Judges, and Sheriffs to kidnap Engineer Joe Gilberti PE who will be providing ENDLESS ANTIOXIDANT SPRING WATER WITH NO CONTAMINATES, OR WATER SHORTAGES and will be lowering all water and power bills to $20/month and saving over $100 million a day just in New York City. Document filed by Joseph D Gilberti.(sac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Main Document
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Thu 11/07 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Evidence- Gilberti Regional Water Supply Permits for Lower Water and Power bills and a Higher Level of Service. Document filed by Joseph D Gilberti..(tro)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Thu 11/07 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Correspondence with FBI to Discuss Fraud Transfer by Sarasota County Commission, Judges, and Sheriffs using racketeering and organized fraud to block antioxidant spring water projects that lower cancer rates, water bills, and power bills. Document filed by Joseph D Gilberti..(tro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
3 3 5 pgs order Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application & Prisoner Authorization Wed 10/23 9:47 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION & PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application & Prisoner Authorization to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States , 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 11/22/2024. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 11/22/2024. Prisoner Authorization Form due by 11/22/2024. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/23/2024) (sac)
Related: [-]
misc Mailing Receipt Wed 10/23 9:53 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Joseph D Gilberti #2024-2237 2020 Main St. Sarasota, FL 34231. (sac)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Fri 10/18 12:31 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 2. Mailed to: Joseph D Gilberti #2024-2237 2020 Main St. Sarasota, FL 34231. (ak)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte Fri 10/18 8:34 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
2 2 order Standing Order re Cases Filed By Pro Se Plaintiffs Thu 10/17 11:35 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may[LINK:consent to electronic service] to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for[LINK:permission to file documents electronically] . Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Chief Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/2024) (job)
Related: [-]
service Note Regarding Service on Self-Represented Party Thu 10/17 11:36 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see[LINK:Rule 9.2] of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information..(job)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/17 11:30 AM
COMPLAINT against Archdiocese of Miami, Archdiocese of New York, Obama Barrack, Joe Biden, Boca Raton ADL, George W. Bush, Jeb Bush, Central Intelligence Agency (CIA), Dick Cheney, City Counsel of New York City, Ron DeSantis, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Bill Gates, Greenberg Traurig Law, Nikky Haley, Harvard University, Lawrence D. Fink Black Rock Investment Group, LLC, Mayor Eric Adams, Elon Musk, New York City Department of Environmental of Protection (NYDEP), New York City Police Department (NYPD), New York City Port Authority, Donna Marie Padar, Sarasota County Commission, Tampa Central Command MacDill Air Force Base, The Pentagon, Donald Trump, United Nations, Yale University. Document filed by Joseph D Gilberti..(job)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 10/17 11:32 AM
Case Designated ECF. (job)
Related: [-]