Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Geraghty
Referred: Walter E Johnson
Case #: 1:24-cv-04701
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 et seq. Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
DHL Express (USA), Inc.
Represented By
Katherine Graham Poirot
Seyfarth Shaw Llp -Atl
contact info
Kyle A. Petersen
Seyfarth Shaw Llp-Il
contact info
Plaintiff
Shenique Pharr
Represented By
Julie Anne Hoehn Burke
Hill, Kertscher & Wharton, LLP
contact info
Douglas R. Kertscher
Hill, Kertscher & Wharton LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Exel, Inc.
Terminated: 11/13/2024
Represented By
Katherine Graham Poirot
Seyfarth Shaw Llp -Atl
contact info
Kyle A. Petersen
Seyfarth Shaw Llp-Il
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
40 40 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/15 8:37 AM
NOTICE by DHL Express (USA), Inc. of Intent to Serve Subpoena(Graham Poirot, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
39 39 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 05/13 10:49 AM
ORDER granting38 Motion for Extension of Time for discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 5/13/25. (klb)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 05/13 10:50 AM
Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery ends on 7/21/2025. Motions for summary judgment no later than 8/20/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/20/2025, or within thirty days from a final ruling on any motion for summary judgment that is not dispositive of all claims advanced by the parties. (klb)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Amend Tue 05/13 11:44 AM
ORAL ORDER granting32 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff's amended complaint to be filed within 10 days of the date of this order. Entered by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 5/13/25. (klb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
38 38 motion Extension of Time Mon 05/12 3:44 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time (Motion to Extend Case Deadlines) by DHL Express (USA), Inc..(Graham Poirot, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
37 37 respm Response to Motion Mon 05/12 3:36 PM
RESPONSE re32 MOTION to Amend1 Complaint, filed by DHL Express (USA), Inc.. (Graham Poirot, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/09 11:53 AM
NOTICE by DHL Express (USA), Inc. of Intent to Serve Subpoena(Graham Poirot, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, May 08, 2025
35 35 discov Certificate of Service Thu 05/08 1:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Notices of Deposition by Shenique Pharr.(Kertscher, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
34 34 discov Certificate of Service Tue 05/06 3:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Third Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant by Shenique Pharr.(Kertscher, Douglas)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 05/06 9:30 AM
Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery ends on 6/19/2025. Motions for summary judgment no later than 7/21/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/21/2025, or within thirty days from a final ruling on any motion for summary judgment that is not dispositive of all claims advanced by the parties. (klb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
33 33 misc Leave of Absence Thu 05/01 2:28 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 07/14/2025, 07/15/2025, 07/16/2025, 07/17/2025, 07/18/2025, by Katherine Graham Poirot. (Graham Poirot, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
32 32 motion Amend Mon 04/28 7:23 PM
MOTION to Amend1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Shenique Pharr. (Kertscher, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
31 31 discov Certificate of Service Thu 04/24 10:29 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition of Stephen Cason by Shenique Pharr.(Kertscher, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
30 30 misc Leave of Absence Thu 04/17 2:10 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 05/17/2025, 05/18/2025, 05/19/2025, 05/20/2025, 05/21/2025, 05/22/2025, 05/23/2025, 05/24/2025, 05/25/2025, 05/26/2025, 05/27/2025, 05/28/2025, 05/29/2025, 05/30/2025, 05/31/2025, 06/01/2025, by Katherine Graham Poirot. (Graham Poirot, Katherine)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Leave of Absence Thu 04/17 9:19 AM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 7/16/2025, 7/17/2025, 7/18/2025, 7/19/2025, 7/20/2025, 7/21/2025, 7/22/2025, 7/23/2025, 7/24/2025, 7/25/2025, 7/26/2025, 7/27/2025, 7/28/2025, 7/29/2025, 7/30/2025, 7/31/2025, by Douglas R. Kertscher. (Kertscher, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
28 28 discov Certificate of Service Thu 04/03 10:37 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Defendant's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents) by DHL Express (USA), Inc..(Graham Poirot, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 04/02 3:38 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion to Stay Pending Mediation. IT IS SO ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion to Stay Pending Mediation is GRANTED, and that all litigation deadlines, including the discovery deadline, are stayed through April 23, 2025. The discovery deadline, summary judgment deadline, and other deadlines are extended by forty-five days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 4/2/25. (klb)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Stay Wed 04/02 3:22 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Mediation by DHL Express (USA), Inc..(Graham Poirot, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, February 28, 2025
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/28 11:04 AM
NOTICE by Shenique Pharr of Intent to Serve Document Subpoena to Sedgwick Claims(Kertscher, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Sedgwick
Thursday, February 27, 2025
24 24 discov Certificate of Service Thu 02/27 2:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Second Requests for Production to Defendant by Shenique Pharr.(Kertscher, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
23 23 discov Certificate of Service Fri 02/21 2:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories) by DHL Express (USA), Inc..(Graham Poirot, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
22 22 discov Certificate of Service Wed 02/19 4:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Discovery Responses by Shenique Pharr.(Kertscher, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
21 21 service Certificate of Service Thu 02/06 8:50 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by DHL Express (USA), Inc. Defendants Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Requests for Production of Documents (Graham Poirot, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
20 20 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Fri 01/24 3:10 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY AND QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/24/25. (klb)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion For Order Fri 01/24 1:11 PM
Joint MOTION for Order Entry of a Confidentiality Order by DHL Express (USA), Inc..(Graham Poirot, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Confidentiality and Qualified HIPAA Protective Order
Friday, January 10, 2025
18 18 discov Certificate of Service Fri 01/10 9:21 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by DHL Express (USA), Inc..(Graham Poirot, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
17 17 discov Certificate of Service Thu 01/09 1:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Interrogatories to Defendant by Shenique Pharr.(Kertscher, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/07 2:16 PM
NOTICE by Shenique Pharr of Intent to Serve Subpoena(Kertscher, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Sedgwick
15 15 order Notice to Parties Regarding Summary Judgment Motions Tue 01/07 2:07 PM
NOTICE to Parties Regarding Summary Judgment Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/7/25. (klb)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/07 2:07 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:13 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. As an initial matter, the undersigned observes that mediation could be successful here, given the parties indication that there is a possibility of settlement. The Court offers the services of its Magistrate Judges to mediate cases at no cost. Should the parties desire to mediate, they may contact the chambers of the Honorable Russell G. Vineyard (404-215-1375), Chief United States Magistrate Judge. Discovery ends on 5/5/2025. Motions under Local Rule 7.1(A)(2) including motions to amend pleadings due by 2/5/2025. Motions for summary judgment no later than 6/4/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/4/2025, or within thirty days from a final ruling on any motion for summary judgment that is not dispositive of all claims advanced by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/7/25. (klb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
13 13 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Mon 01/06 2:29 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by DHL Express (USA), Inc.. (Graham Poirot, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
12 12 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/06 2:35 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by DHL Express (USA), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent DPWN Holdings (USA), Inc. for DHL Express (USA), Inc.. (Graham Poirot, Katherine)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/06 2:28 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by DHL Express (USA), Inc.. Discovery ends on 5/5/2025.(Graham Poirot, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
10 10 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/14 3:36 PM
ORDER granting6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kyle A. Petersen. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 11/14/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Wed 11/13 10:15 AM
ORDER - the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to TERMINATE defendant Exel, Inc. from this action and substitute DHL Express (USA), Inc. in its place. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 11/13/24. (klb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulation Tue 11/12 3:00 PM
STIPULATION to Correct Caption and Identify Correct Defendant by Exel, Inc.. (Graham Poirot, Katherine)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Tue 11/12 11:05 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:6 APPLICATION for Admission of Kyle A. Petersen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13853289). Attorney Kyle A. Petersen added appearing on behalf of Exel, Inc.. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (jas)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 11/08 8:53 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. Exel, Inc. Answer due 12/6/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 11/8/24. (klb)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/08 8:40 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Kyle A. Petersen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13853289).by Exel, Inc.. (Graham Poirot, Katherine)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Fri 11/08 7:54 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Exel, Inc..(Graham Poirot, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/08 7:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Graham Poirot on behalf of Exel, Inc. (Graham Poirot, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
3 3 service Return of Service Executed Wed 10/23 8:51 AM
Return of Service Executed by Shenique Pharr. Exel, Inc. served on 10/21/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (Kertscher, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 10/17 10:42 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Exel, Inc. (ane)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/17 10:41 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Shenique Pharr. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-1379608)(ane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet