Maryland District Court
Judge:Erin Aslan
Case #: 1:24-cv-03004
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration
Represented By
Matthew T. Shea
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Signor Lucas, Jr
14 Hartley Circle Apt. 536
Owings Mills, MD 21117


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/28 3:39 PM
NOTICE (Answer for Lawsuit Eligibility) by Signor Lucas, Jr (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/22 4:00 PM
RETURN DOCUMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan on 4/22/2025.(c/m by BM intake 04/22/2025 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Page of Returned Document
Monday, March 03, 2025
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 03/03 1:27 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration.(Shea, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 02/19 9:51 AM
RESPONSE (Answer to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) filed by Signor Lucas, Jr. re:18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
20 20 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Tue 01/21 2:54 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration.(bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Rule 12/56 Tue 01/21 9:31 AM
Rule 12/56 notice emailed to Signor Lucas, Jr (c/em p 1/21/2025 bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
18 18 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 01/17 2:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration(Shea, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, January 06, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 01/06 10:55 AM
ORDER granting12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan on 1/6/2025. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Mon 01/06 9:02 AM
QC NOTICE: 13 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration was filed incorrectly. **Not all pdf documents were flattened prior to filing. All pdfs uploaded to CM/ECF MUST BE FLATTENED for all future filings. Failure to comply may result in rejected filings and delays in case processing. **This filing has been corrected by court staff and no further corrective action is required. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
15 15 order 25 Pct Mag - ORDER: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge Mon 01/06 8:56 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan on 1/6/2025. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Mon 01/06 8:55 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan. Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration or counsel for Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Standing Order 2019-07, can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 01/03 5:33 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration(Shea, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, December 09, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Mon 12/09 2:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Attorney General served on 11/11/2024, answer due 1/10/2025.(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
notice EDSS Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Mon 11/18 9:54 AM
Documents submitted via EDSS. Signor Lucas, Jr consents to receive notice and service electronically. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Thu 11/14 4:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Attorney served on 11/7/2024, answer due 1/6/2025.(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
8 8 order 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order Mon 11/04 2:53 PM
Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan on 11/4/2024. (c/m 11/04/2024 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued as to USA Mon 11/04 2:51 PM
Summons Issued 60 days as to Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(c/em USMS 11/04/2024 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM Forms
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Mon 11/04 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan. Signor Lucas, Jr or counsel for Signor Lucas, Jr are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/18/2024. (c/m 11/04/2024 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 10/30 12:40 PM
ORDER granting2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Plaintiff to return completed U.S. Marshal and summons forms to the Clerk within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order; directing the Clerk to issue summons upon receipt and forward to U.S. Marshal; directing U.S. Marshal to effectuate service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan on 10/30/2024. (c/m with forms 10/30/2024 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
4 4 misc Supplement Tue 10/22 3:49 PM
Supplement to1 Complaint filed by Signor Lucas, Jr(Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Thursday, October 17, 2024
3 3 misc New Case Notification Letter Thu 10/17 2:12 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Signor Lucas, Jr. (c/m to P 10/17/24 - av4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 10/17 2:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Signor Lucas, Jr (av4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/17 2:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration, filed by Signor Lucas, Jr. (av4s)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons