North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Frank D Whitney
Referred: Susan C Rodriguez
Case #: 3:24-cv-00920
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disability Act
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2024
Terminated:Dec 16, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Watson Electrical Construction Co. LLC
Represented By
Benjamin Paul Fryer
Ford & Harrison LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sean Carder
Represented By
Kevin Patrick Murphy
Herrmann & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Sean Franklin Herrmann
Herrmann & Murphy, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, December 16, 2024
4 4 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 12/16 3:33 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Sean Carder (All Claims Dismissed. Case to be Closed). (Herrmann, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/01 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Paul Fryer on behalf of Watson Electrical Construction Co. LLC (Fryer, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 10/18 9:56 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Watson Electrical Construction Co. LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (add)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/17 6:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Watson Electrical Construction Co. LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6704109), filed by Sean Carder.(Herrmann, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 10/18 9:54 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (add)
Related: [-]
utility Initial Scheduling Order Entry - Judge Whitney Fri 10/18 9:54 AM
Clerk's Entry and Service of[LINK:Initial Scheduling Order] and[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form] pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (add)
Related: [-]
utility Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence Fri 10/18 9:54 AM
Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order (add)
Related: [-]