Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:24-cv-01714
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 2:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Holly Waeger Monster
Represented By
Michelle R. Lambert
Us Attorney'S Office (tacoma)
contact info
Defendant
Antony J Blinken
Represented By
Michelle R. Lambert
Us Attorney'S Office (tacoma)
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-10
Represented By
Michelle R. Lambert
Us Attorney'S Office (tacoma)
contact info
Plaintiff
Abdul Wasae
Represented By
Jennifer Nimer
Nimer Law Llc (oh)
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
17 17 order KKE Order Re Chambers Procedures CV (FORM) Tue 05/06 10:50 AM
ORDER REGARDING CHAMBERS PROCEDURES IN CIVIL CASES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Tue 04/01 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re14 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Abdul Wasae(Nimer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit ARAMNAHAD v RUBIO et al,
Att: 2 Exhibit KHOSRAVI et al v RUBIO et al
Friday, March 21, 2025
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/21 4:20 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendants Antony J Blinken, Holly Waeger Monster, TO RESPONSE to9 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) (Lambert, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
14 14 respm Response to Motion Fri 03/14 8:49 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Abdul Wasae, to9 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) .(Nimer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/11 9:40 AM
ORDER granting Parties'12 Stipulated Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines. Plaintiff shall file a response to the pending motion to dismiss (Dkt. No.9 ) by 3/14/2025. Defendants shall file any reply by 3/21/2025. The Clerk shall re-note the motion (Dkt. No.9 ) for 3/21/2025. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
12 12 motion Extension of Time-Other Mon 02/10 3:00 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time re9 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) , filed by Plaintiff Abdul Wasae. Noting Date 2/10/2025, (Nimer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
11 11 5 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/24 10:17 AM
ORDER granting Parties'10 Stipulated Motion. Discovery, including the initial discovery deadlines are stayed pending the Court's decision on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No.9 ). If the motion is denied, the parties shall propose a new initial scheduling deadlines within 14 days of the order. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
10 10 motion Stipulated Motion Wed 01/22 4:54 PM
Stipulated MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND [PROPOSED] ORDER , filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 1/22/2025, (Lambert, Michelle)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss Wed 01/22 4:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) , filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 2/19/2025, (Lambert, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 20, 2024
8 8 order 2 - Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 12/20 3:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER (text only): Per the parties' stipulated motion (Dkt. No. 7), the deadline for Defendants to respond to the complaint is now January 23, 2025. Authorized by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Stipulated Motion Fri 12/20 12:47 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline and [Proposed] Order , filed by Defendants Antony J Blinken, Holly Waeger Monster, Does 1-10. Noting Date 12/20/2024, (Lambert, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
6 6 order 1 - Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 12/18 7:51 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/8/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/22/2025, Joint Status Report due by 1/29/2025. (DS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/17 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendants Antony J Blinken, Holly Waeger Monster, Does 1-10. (Lambert, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 10/28 3:08 PM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Antony J Blinken on 10/25/2024; Does 1-10 on 10/25/2024; Holly Waeger Monster on 10/25/2024(Nimer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit certified mail receipt
Friday, October 18, 2024
3 3 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Fri 10/18 3:19 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 10/18 11:37 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants(HH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons to Consulate General,
Att: 2 Summons to USAG,
Att: 3 Summons to USAO
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 10/18 11:26 AM
District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson added. (HH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/17 6:48 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Antony J. Blinken, John Does #1-#10, Holly Waeger Monster Related [+] Attorney Jennifer Nimer added to party Abdul Wasae(pty:pla) filed by Abdul Wasae.(Nimer, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8678244
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Summons Blinken,
Att: 4 Summons Consul General,
Att: 5 Summons USAG,
Att: 6 Summons USAO,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet