Original Case: 4:24-cv-00930

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-03105
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2024
Terminated:Dec 17, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 18, 2024 3:39 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
Joan Gilmer
Represented By
Willie Thomas McGarry
ST. LOUIS COUNTY COUNSELOR'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri
Represented By
Fola Soluade
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Eric Garland
Represented By
Eric Garland
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/18/2024 3:39 AM CST
Thursday, October 17, 2024
Civil case docketed. [5447269] 24-3105 (CMH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs ProSe Docketing Letter
Att: 2 1 pgs ProSe NDA
18 pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order 09/30/2024, and Order of Dismissal 09/30/2024. [5447287] 24-3105 (CMH)
Related: [-]
1 pgs CLERK ORDER: The $605 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 11/07/2024, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [5447288] 24-3105 (CMH)
Related: [-]
1 pgs CLERK ORDER: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5447291] 24-3105 (CMH)
Related: [-]