Delaware District Court
Judge:Gregory B Williams
Case #: 1:24-cv-01162
Nature of Suit835 Property Rights - Patent – Abbreviated New Drug Application
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2024
Terminated:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Lannett Company, Inc.
Plaintiff
Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd
Represented By
Andrew Colin Mayo
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Steven J. Balick
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Plaintiff
Actelion Pharmaceuticals US, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Colin Mayo
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Steven J. Balick
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Plaintiff
Shinyaku Co., Ltd.
Represented By
Andrew Colin Mayo
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Steven J. Balick
Ashby & Geddes
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, January 23, 2025
11 11 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Thu 01/23 10:05 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (lnb)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Judgment - Consent Thu 01/23 10:02 AM
CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 1/23/2025. (lnb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
9 9 misc Consent Judgment - Proposed Wed 01/22 2:55 PM
PROPOSED CONSENT JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTION, by Actelion Pharmaceuticals US, Inc., Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd, Shinyaku Co., Ltd.. (Balick, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
order SO ORDERED Tue 12/31 11:47 AM
SO ORDERED, re8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd, Shinyaku Co., Ltd., Actelion Pharmaceuticals US, Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 12/31/24. (jaa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 12/17 12:43 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - filed by Actelion Pharmaceuticals US, Inc., Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd, Shinyaku Co., Ltd.. (Balick, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 day ddl Thu 10/24 2:50 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Actelion Pharmaceuticals US, Inc., Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd, Shinyaku Co., Ltd.: For Lannett Company, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2024, answer due 12/23/2024. (Balick, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/23 1:06 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Fri 10/18 9:30 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Shinyaku Co., Ltd.. (scs)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Fri 10/18 9:29 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd, Actelion Pharmaceuticals US, Inc. filed by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd, Actelion Pharmaceuticals US, Inc. (scs)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Fri 10/18 9:24 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,791,122; 9,284,280. (scs)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc ANDA Form Fri 10/18 9:23 AM
Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 09/08/2024. Date of Expiration of Patent: 06/25/2030. Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 3/9/2027. (scs)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Fri 10/18 9:21 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (scs)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/18 9:20 AM
COMPLAINT for ANDA/PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Lannett Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4526668.) - filed by Actelion Pharmaceuticals US, Inc., Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd, Shinyaku Co., Ltd..(scs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
service No Summons Issued Fri 10/18 9:32 AM
No Summons Issued. (scs)
Related: [-]