Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Colleen R Lawless
Referred: Eric I Long
Case #: 3:24-cv-03289
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 3:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Almdale Brooke
Represented By
Randall W Slade
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Mikayla S. Young
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Defendant
Ashley Dorr
Represented By
Randall W Slade
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Mikayla S. Young
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Gill
Represented By
Randall W Slade
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Mikayla S. Young
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Defendant
Rebecca Koen
Represented By
Randall W Slade
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Mikayla S. Young
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Defendant
Lisa Leardi
Represented By
Randall W Slade
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Mikayla S. Young
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Robinson
Represented By
Randall W Slade
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Mikayla S. Young
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Defendant
Angela Royer
Defendant
Springfield School District No. 186
Represented By
Randall W Slade
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Mikayla S. Young
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Defendant
Amelia Zibutis
Represented By
Randall W Slade
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Mikayla S. Young
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Defendant
Ward Lamon
Represented By
Randall W Slade
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Mikayla S. Young
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Defendant
Gina Schurman
Represented By
Randall W Slade
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Mikayla S. Young
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Defendant
City of Springfield
Represented By
Randall W Slade
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynette Ware
Represented By
Kendra Danielle Spearman
Spearman Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 04/25 5:17 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed by Plaintiff Lynette Ware. Responses due by 5/9/2025 (Spearman, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/28 12:41 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply UnOPPOSED; FIRST REQUEST by Plaintiff Lynette Ware. Responses due by 4/25/2025 (Spearman, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
13 13 15 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 03/21 6:23 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Almdale Brooke, City of Springfield, Ashley Dorr, Jennifer Gill, Rebecca Koen, Ward Lamon, Lisa Leardi, Ryan Robinson, Gina Schurman, Springfield School District No. 186, Amelia Zibutis. Responses due by 4/4/2025 (Slade, Randall)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
12 12 15 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/03 11:51 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brooke Almdale, Ashley Dorr, Jennifer Gill, Rebecca Kohen, Ward Lamon, Lisa Leardi, Ryan Robinson, Springfield School District No. 186, Amelia Zibutis, filed by Lynette Ware. (KLC)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 03/03 11:41 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/28/2025: Plaintiff's unopposed Motion10 for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED for the reasons stated in the Motion. Defendants' deadline to file a response is extended to March 21, 2025. The Clerk is directed to file Exhibit A10 as Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Plead11 is DENIED as moot. (KLC)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines (including Answer ddl) Mon 03/03 11:57 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Brooke Almdale answer due 3/21/2025; Ashley Dorr answer due 3/21/2025; Jennifer Gill answer due 3/21/2025; Rebecca Kohen answer due 3/21/2025; Ward Lamon answer due 3/21/2025; Lisa Leardi answer due 3/21/2025; Ryan Robinson answer due 3/21/2025; Springfield School District No. 186 answer due 3/21/2025; Amelia Zibutis answer due 3/21/2025. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 02/24 6:29 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re8 Amended Complaint by Defendants Almdale Brooke, City of Springfield, Ashley Dorr, Jennifer Gill, Rebecca Koen, Ward Lamon, Lisa Leardi, Ryan Robinson, Gina Schurman, Springfield School District No. 186, Amelia Zibutis. Responses due by 3/10/2025 (Slade, Randall)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Amend/Correct Mon 02/24 4:57 PM
Second MOTION to Amend/Correct UNOPPOSED, Second Request by Plaintiff Lynette Ware. (Spearman, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 02/21 3:42 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/21/2025: Defendants' unopposed Motion9 to extend the time to make a responsive pleading is GRANTED for the reasons stated in the Motion. Defendants must file a response by February 24, 2025. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 02/17 4:41 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re8 Amended Complaint by Defendants Ryan Robinson, Ward Lamon, Gina Schurman, Springfield School District No. 186, Jennifer Gill, Lisa Leardi, Amelia Zibutis, Almdale Brooke, Ashley Dorr, Rebecca Koen. Responses due by 3/3/2025 (Slade, Randall)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
8 8 13 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/27 9:34 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Almdale Brooke, City of Springfield, Ashley Dorr, Jennifer Gill, Rebecca Koen, Ward Lamon, Lisa Leardi, Ryan Robinson, Angela Royer, Springfield School District No. 186, Amelia Zibutis, filed by Lynette Ware. (KLC)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 01/27 8:50 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/24/2025: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint7 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to file Exhibit A as Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
7 7 motion Amend/Correct Fri 01/17 5:44 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct unOPPOSED; FIRST REQUEST by Plaintiff Lynette Ware. Responses due by 1/31/2025 (Spearman, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
order Order Reassigning Case Mon 01/06 9:31 PM
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
6 6 4 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/23 1:46 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint Unopposed by Defendants Ryan Robinson, Ward Lamon, Gina Schurman, Springfield School District No. 186, Jennifer Gill, Lisa Leardi, Amelia Zibutis, Almdale Brooke, Ashley Dorr, Rebecca Koen, Plaintiff Lynette Ware. Responses due by 1/6/2025 (Slade, Randall)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 12/23 4:12 PM
TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 12/23/2024: The unopposed Motion for Extension of Time6 filed by defendants Springfield School District 186, Jennifer Gill, Gina Schurman, Lisa Leardi, Ward Lamon, Amelia Zibutis, Almdale Brooke, Ashley Dorr, Rebecca Koen, and Ryan Robinson to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is GRANTED for the reasons stated therein. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 1/17/2025. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 11/27 8:42 AM
TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 11/27/2024: The Motion for Extension of Time5 filed by defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is GRANTED for the reasons stated therein. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 12/24/2024. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
5 5 3 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 11/26 1:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Defendants Ryan Robinson, Ward Lamon, Gina Schurman, Springfield School District No. 186, Jennifer Gill, Lisa Leardi, Amelia Zibutis, Almdale Brooke, Ashley Dorr, Rebecca Koen. Responses due by 12/10/2024 (Slade, Randall)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Tue 11/26 1:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mikayla S. Young on behalf of Ryan Robinson, Ward Lamon, Gina Schurman, Springfield School District No. 186, Jennifer Gill, Lisa Leardi, Amelia Zibutis, Almdale Brooke, Ashley Dorr, Rebecca Koen (Young, Mikayla)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Tue 11/26 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Randall W Slade on behalf of Ward Lamon, Gina Schurman, Ryan Robinson, Springfield School District No. 186, Jennifer Gill, Lisa Leardi, Amelia Zibutis, Almdale Brooke, Ashley Dorr, Rebecca Koen (Slade, Randall)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Fri 10/18 7:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kendra Danielle Spearman on behalf of Lynette Ware (Spearman, Kendra)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Attorney Complaint Fri 10/18 7:27 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILCDC-4586346.), filed by Lynette Ware.(Spearman, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet