Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-11254

Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 2:24-ap-01041
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Pelican State Industrial Medicine
Represented By
Pelican State Industrial Medicine
contact info
Plaintiff
Dwayne M. Murray
Represented By
Christopher T. Caplinger
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
12 12 motion Continue Hearing Tue 04/15 4:53 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On April 23, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Katherine Elizabeth Clark of Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard on behalf of Dwayne M. Murray (Clark, Katherine)
Related: [-] 4 Order
Att: 1 Draft Order
Monday, March 31, 2025
11 11 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 03/31 1:24 PM
Clerk's Entry of Defaul Related [+]. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 10 Request for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
Friday, March 28, 2025
10 10 miscap Request for Entry of Default (PF) Fri 03/28 4:32 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default against Pelican State Industrial Medicine, Inc. Filed by Dwayne M. Murray (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
9 9 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/05 9:56 AM
Summons Service Executed on Pelican State Industrial Medicine 2/26/2025 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
8 8 court Summons Issued (AP) Mon 02/24 12:29 PM
Summons Re-issued on Pelican State Industrial Medicine Answer Due 3/26/2025. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
7 7 miscap Request for Issuance of Summons (PF) Fri 02/21 1:22 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons Filed by Dwayne M. Murray (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/13 2:38 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Dwayne M. Murray on behalf of Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray. (Murray, Dwayne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
5 5 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Tue 11/05 3:46 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)4 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Thursday, October 24, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 10/24 4:46 PM
Order Regarding Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order. Docket Call for this trial will be held on April 23, 2025 at 2:00 pm at 3rd Floor, Courtroom 5, 800 Lafayette St, Lafayette, LA 70501. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 10/24/24 Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 10/18 4:44 PM
Summons Service Executed on Pelican State Industrial Medicine 10/18/2024 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (AP) Fri 10/18 9:39 AM
Summons Issued on Pelican State Industrial Medicine Answer Due 11/18/2024. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/17 1:58 PM
Adversary case 24-01041 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Fraudulent and/or Preferential Transfers by Dwayne M. Murray against Pelican State Industrial Medicine. Fee Amount $350. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Cover sheet