Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-11254

Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 2:24-ap-01043
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Akiro Consulting, LLC
Represented By
Akiro Consulting, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dwayne M. Murray
Represented By
Christopher T. Caplinger
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Saturday, March 01, 2025
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Sat 03/01 11:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)18 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding) Notice Date 03/01/2025. (Admin.
Thursday, February 27, 2025
18 18 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) (AP) Thu 02/27 2:56 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice. Related [+] Signed on February 27, 2025. (Nunnery, J.)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
17 17 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) (AP) Wed 02/26 2:10 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Filed by Dwayne M. Murray (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
16 16 order Extend Time (Order) (AP) Mon 02/03 11:56 AM
Order Granting Litigation Trustee's Unopposed Ex Parte Motion for the Extension of Time to Plead. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 2/3/25. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Extend Time filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
utility Reset Answer Deadline (AP) Mon 02/03 11:57 AM
Akiro Consulting, LLC Answer Deadline Reset for 2/10/2025. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
15 15 motion Extend Time (Motion) (AP) Fri 01/31 4:15 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time Litigation Trustee's Unopposed Ex Parte Motion for the Extension of Time to Plead Filed by Dwayne M. Murray (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
14 14 order Extend Time (Order) (AP) Thu 01/16 12:09 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Plead. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 1/16/25. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Extend Time filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
utility Reset Answer Deadline (AP) Thu 01/16 12:10 PM
Akiro Consulting, LLC Answer Deadline Reset for 2/3/2025. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
13 13 motion Extend Time (Motion) (AP) Wed 01/15 4:20 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time Litigation Trustee's Unopposed Ex Parte for the Extension of Time to Plead Filed by Dwayne M. Murray (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 12/30 11:28 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time and Continue Docket Call for Trial. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on December 23, 2024 Related [+] Trial Docket Call scheduled for 6/18/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Nunnery, J.)
Related: [-] 4 Order,11 Motion to Continue Trial filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
11 11 motion Continue Trial (Motion) (AP) Wed 12/18 5:32 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Continue Trial on Consent Motion to Consent Motion to Continue Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Docket Call for Trial and Related Deadlines Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)10 Order on Motion to Extend Time) (Caplinger, Christopher
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
10 10 order Extend Time (Order) (AP) Wed 11/27 12:57 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on November 27, 2024. (Nunnery, J.)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Extend Time filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
utility Reset Answer Deadline (AP) Wed 11/27 12:58 PM
Akiro Consulting, LLC Answer Deadline Reset for 12/20/2024. (Nunnery, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
9 9 motion Extend Time (Motion) (AP) Tue 11/26 3:21 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Litigation Trustee's Unopposed Motion for the Extension of Time to Plead and Time to Submit Proposed Scheduling Order or Request a Status Conference Filed by Dwayne M. Murray (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/13 2:55 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Dwayne M. Murray on behalf of Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray. (Murray, Dwayne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
7 7 order Extend Time (Order) Tue 11/12 5:13 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Plead. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 11/12/24. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Extend Time filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
6 6 motion 03Extend Time Tue 11/12 3:09 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time Filed by Katherine Elizabeth Clark of Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard on behalf of Dwayne M. Murray (Clark, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Draft Order
utility Reset Answer Deadline (AP) Tue 11/12 5:13 PM
Akiro Consulting, LLC Answer Deadline Reset for 12/2/2024. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
5 5 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Tue 11/05 3:48 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)4 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Thursday, October 24, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 10/24 4:49 PM
Order Regarding Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order. Docket Call for this trial will be held on April 23, 2025 at 2:00 pm at 3rd Floor, Courtroom 5, 800 Lafayette St, Lafayette, LA 70501. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 10/24/24 Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 10/18 4:40 PM
Summons Service Executed on Akiro Consulting, LLC 10/18/2024 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (AP) Fri 10/18 9:54 AM
Summons Issued on Akiro Consulting, LLC Answer Due 11/18/2024. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/17 2:06 PM
Adversary case 24-01043 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Fraudulent Transfers by Dwayne M. Murray against Akiro Consulting, LLC. Fee Amount $350. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Cover sheet