Nebraska District Court
Judge:John M Gerrard
Case #: 4:24-cv-03188
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 3:26 AM CDT
Defendant
RK Mission Critical, LLC
20101 E. 36th Drive
Aurora, CO 80011
Represented By
Sally Piskun
Berg, Hill Law Firm
contact info
Thomas Q. Swanson
Hilgers, Graben Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
JJ Westhoff Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By
Jay E. Heidrick
Polsinelli Law Firm
contact info
Blake E. Johnson
Bruning Law Group
contact info
Elizabeth M. Marden
Polsinelli Law Firm
contact info
MacGregor Greenlee
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jigowatt, LLC
Represented By
Jay E. Heidrick
Polsinelli Law Firm
contact info
Blake E. Johnson
Bruning Law Group
contact info
Elizabeth M. Marden
Polsinelli Law Firm
contact info
MacGregor Greenlee
Polsinelli PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
RK Industries, LLC
Terminated: 02/24/2025
3800 Xanthia Street
Denver, CO 80238
Represented By
Thomas Q. Swanson
Hilgers, Graben Law Firm
contact info

GPO Feb 25 2025
PROTECTIVE ORDER Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, Filing No. 26, the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (LRM)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
40 40 oth_doc Certificate Thu 05/08 11:49 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Sally Piskun on behalf of Defendant RK Mission Critical, LLC.(Piskun, Sally)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
39 39 oth_doc Certificate Mon 05/05 1:37 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Sally Piskun on behalf of Defendant RK Mission Critical, LLC.(Piskun, Sally)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
38 38 oth_doc Certificate Fri 04/04 10:56 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Sally Piskun on behalf of Defendant RK Mission Critical, LLC.(Piskun, Sally)
Related: [-]
37 37 oth_doc Certificate Fri 04/04 5:01 PM
Certificate of Service - Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures by Attorney Blake E. Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff JJ Westhoff Construction Company, Inc..(Johnson, Blake)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/25 5:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Sally Piskun on behalf of Defendant RK Mission Critical, LLC (Piskun, Sally)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Protective Order Tue 02/25 2:21 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, Filing No.26 , the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (LRM)
Related: [-]
34 34 3 pgs order Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW) Tue 02/25 2:20 PM
FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 02/06/2026. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on February 10, 2026 at 9:30 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (LRM)
Related: [-]
33 33 minutes Telephone Conference Tue 02/25 1:39 PM
TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. Telephone Conference held on February 25, 2025 to discuss case progression and discovery limitations. As discussed on the record, the limits set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will govern unless otherwise ordered. Final case progression order forthcoming. Time Start: 1:00 PM; Time Stop: 1:24 PM; Time in Court: 24 minutes. (TMM)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
32 32 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 02/24 3:26 PM
TEXT ORDER granting30 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Elizabeth Marden is withdrawn as counsel for Jigowatt, LLC and JJ Westhoff Construction Company, Inc. and will no longer receive electronic notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (TMM)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Mon 02/24 11:09 AM
TEXT ORDER: On the plaintiffs'29 notice of dismissal, the plaintiffs' claims against RK Industries, LLC are dismissed, and RK Industries, LLC is terminated as a party. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 02/24 9:57 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Elizabeth Marden by Attorney Blake E. Johnson on behalf of Plaintiffs JJ Westhoff Construction Company, Inc., Jigowatt, LLC.(Johnson, Blake)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/24 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant RK Industries LLC by Attorney Blake E. Johnson on behalf of Plaintiffs JJ Westhoff Construction Company, Inc., Jigowatt, LLC (Johnson, Blake)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
28 28 order Order Setting Hearing or Trial Wed 02/19 12:08 PM
TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: A telephone conference to discuss case progression is set for February 25, 2025 at 1:00 PM before the undersigned magistrate judge. The parties should use the case conference instructions assigned to this case to participate. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (TMM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
27 27 order Order - Consent (TEXT ONLY) Tue 02/18 8:05 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Senior Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (LKO)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
26 26 oth_doc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 02/14 10:10 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Blake E. Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff JJ Westhoff Construction Company, Inc..(Johnson, Blake)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
25 25 order Order on Motion to Extend Mon 02/10 4:25 PM
TEXT ORDER granting24 Motion to Extend. The parties shall jointly file a Rule 26(f) report on or before Friday, February 14, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (TMM)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Extend Mon 02/10 4:07 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Deadlines to Confer and File Rule 26(f) Report by Attorney Blake E. Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff JJ Westhoff Construction Company, Inc..(Johnson, Blake)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
23 23 oth_ans Amended Answer to Complaint Fri 01/31 5:08 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand regarding: Complaint1 by RK Industries, LLC, RK Mission Critical, LLC (Swanson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
22 22 oth_evt Restricted Case Conference Instructions - WebEx Mon 01/13 9:47 AM
RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (MKR)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Scheduling Order - Consent Mon 01/13 9:45 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER - CONSENT- Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 2/10/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (MKR)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/10 6:50 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by RK Industries, LLC, RK Mission Critical, LLC (Swanson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/06 4:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant RK Mission Critical, LLC on 12/2/2024. (Johnson, Blake)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/06 4:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant RK Industries, LLC on 12/2/2024. (Johnson, Blake)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
17 17 service Summons Issued Tue 11/19 11:46 AM
Summons Issued as to defendants RK Industries, LLC and RK Mission Critical, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Requested Tue 11/19 11:05 AM
Summons Requested as to RK Mission Critical LLC regarding Complaint1 . (Johnson, Blake)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Requested Tue 11/19 11:04 AM
Summons Requested as to RK Industries LLC regarding Complaint1 . (Johnson, Blake)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/04 8:43 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice11 for attorney Jay E. Heidrick. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
13 13 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Fri 11/01 4:32 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Blake E. Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff JJ Westhoff Construction Company, Inc..(Johnson, Blake)
Related: [-]
12 12 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Fri 11/01 4:32 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Blake E. Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff Jigowatt, LLC.(Johnson, Blake)
Related: [-]
11 11 oth_doc Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/01 8:36 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5191344 by Attorney Jay E. Heidrick on behalf of Plaintiffs Jigowatt, LLC, JJ Westhoff Construction Company, Inc..(Heidrick, Jay)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
10 10 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/28 11:10 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice9 for attorney MacGregor Greenlee. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
Related: [-]
9 9 oth_doc Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/28 10:30 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5188211 by Attorney MacGregor Greenlee on behalf of Plaintiffs Jigowatt, LLC, JJ Westhoff Construction Company, Inc..(Greenlee, MacGregor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/24 10:45 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice7 for attorney Elizabeth M. Marden. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
Related: [-]
7 7 oth_doc Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/24 10:28 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5186540 by Attorney Elizabeth M. Marden on behalf of Plaintiffs JJ Westhoff Construction Company, Inc., Jigowatt, LLC.(Marden, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
6 6 oth_evt Attorney Letter Fri 10/18 2:32 PM
ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney MacGregor Greenlee has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
Related: [-]
5 5 oth_evt Attorney Letter Fri 10/18 2:32 PM
ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Jay E. Heidrick has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/18 2:26 PM
TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Jigowatt, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (JES)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/18 2:26 PM
TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff JJ Westhoff Construction Company, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (JES)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_evt Assignment of Judges Fri 10/18 2:24 PM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/18 1:50 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5183230), by Attorney Blake E. Johnson on behalf of Jigowatt, LLC, JJ Westhoff Construction Company, Inc.(Johnson, Blake)
Related: [-]