Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Karen S Marston
Case #: 2:24-cv-05551
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 4:36 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Mission First Tactical, LLC
Represented By
LINDSAY ANDREUZZI
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Jason Jackson
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Magpul Industries Corp
Represented By
BRIAN E MITCHELL
Mitchell + Company
contact info
EDWARD F. BORDEN, JR.
Earp Cohn PC
contact info
Defendant
Mission First Tactical Group, Inc.
945 Horsham Road
Horsham, PA 19044
Represented By
LINDSAY ANDREUZZI
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Jason Jackson
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mission First Tactical, LLC
945 Horsham Road
Horsham, PA 19044
Represented By
LINDSAY ANDREUZZI
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Jason Jackson
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Scott Joseph Strohm
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Magpul Industries Corp
5408 U.S. Highway 290 West
Austin, TX 78735
Represented By
BRIAN E MITCHELL
Mitchell + Company
contact info
EDWARD F. BORDEN, JR.
Earp Cohn PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
38 38 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 05/08 3:17 PM
ORDER granting37 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF DANIEL A. CROWE, COLIN D. DAILEY AND LEIF OLSON. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 5/8/25.5/8/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 05/08 8:52 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18275427.) filed by Magpul Industries Corp.Declarations, Certificate of Service.(BORDEN, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
36 36 misc Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Tue 05/06 6:14 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re35 Transcript - PDF, 5/5/25 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (rf, )
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Transcript - PDF Tue 05/06 6:12 AM
TRANSCRIPT of STATUS HEARING held on 4/28/25, before Judge MARSTON. Court Reporter/Transcriber M.MCCARTHY. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/27/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2025. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
34 34 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/28 1:23 PM
ORDER THAT DEADLINE FOR DEFT MISSION FIRST TACTICAL LLC TO FILE ANY MOTION SEEKING FEES, COSTS AND OTHER REMEDIES ASSOCIATED WITH PLAINTIFF MAGPUL INDUSTRIES CORPS ASSERTION OF CLAIMS IS STAYED AS OUTLINE HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 4/28/25. 4/28/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
33 33 minutes Status Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 04/28 12:01 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON Status Conference held on 4/28/25. Court Reporter: ESR. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
32 32 misc Status Report Fri 04/25 12:07 PM
STATUS REPORT by Mission First Tactical, LLC. (Jackson, Jason)
Related: [-]
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Fri 04/25 10:37 AM
ORDER granting30 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF BRIAN W. BARNES AND VINCENT J. COLATRIANO. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 4/25/25.4/25/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Fri 04/25 7:26 AM
Second MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18242937.) filed by Magpul Industries Corp.Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.(BORDEN, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/22 2:16 PM
ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING ALL OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY ISSUES NO LATER THAN 4/25/25 AT 12:00PM. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 4/22/25. 4/22/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
28 28 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/22 1:05 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE RELATING TO U.S. PATENT NO. 10,072,903. THIS DISMISSAL SHALL HAVE NO EFFECT ON ANY CLAIMS, DEFENSES OR COUNTERCLAIMS ASSERTED IN THIS ACTION BY EITHER PARTY AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 4/22/25. 4/22/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/22 6:23 AM
ORDER THAT TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/22/25 IS CANCELLED. IN PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/28/2025 10:30 AM IN Courtroom 16B. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 4/21/25. 4/22/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
26 26 misc Status Report Fri 04/18 8:46 PM
STATUS REPORT by Mission First Tactical, LLC.(Jackson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/15 11:46 AM
ORDER THAT PARTIES A SUBMIT A JOINT STATUS REPORT AS OUTLINED HEREIN NO LATER THAN 4/18/25. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/22/2025 10:00 AM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS., STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/22/2025 10:30 AM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 4/15/25. 4/15/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
24 24 minutes Telephone Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 04/15 10:33 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON Telephone Conference held on 4/15/25 (rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
23 23 misc Status Report Wed 04/02 9:39 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Claim Construction Statement by Magpul Industries Corp.(BORDEN, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 03/12 1:55 PM
ORDER granting21 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF SCOTT J. STROHM. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 3/12/25.3/12/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
21 21 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 03/06 11:34 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Scott J. Strohm ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18122246.) filed by Mission First Tactical, LLC.Declaration and Certificate of Service.(ANDREUZZI, LINDSAY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Court Admissions
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
20 20 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Tue 02/11 6:05 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Mission First Tactical, LLC.(Jackson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
19 19 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 01/02 8:23 PM
Plaintiff's ANSWER to18 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Mission First Tactical LLC by Magpul Industries Corp.(BORDEN, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 12/12 2:41 PM
ANSWER to Complaint First Amended with Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM against Magpul Industries Corp by Mission First Tactical, LLC.(ANDREUZZI, LINDSAY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
17 17 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 12/03 3:17 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT COUNSEL SHALL PARTICIPATE IN A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS TO BE HELD VIA ZOOM ON 10/16/25 AT 10:00 AM, A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 4/15/25 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON, DISCOVERY DUE BY 1/9/26, MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE DUE BY 2/9/26. A HEARING ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION IS SET FOR 7/30/25 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 16B, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET ST., PHILA., PA. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 12/3/24. 12/3/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 12/03 3:18 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: MISCELLANEOUS HEARING SET FOR 7/30/2025 10:00 AM IN Courtroom 16B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
16 16 minutes Telephone Conference Wed 11/27 5:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON Telephone Conference held on 11/26/24 (JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
15 15 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Thu 11/21 4:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON. Re: A Pretrial/Rule 16 Conference was held on 11/20/24. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/20 9:32 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs., filed by Magpul Industries Corp.(BORDEN, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Mon 11/18 6:42 AM
ORDER granting11 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE; granting12 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 11/15/24.11/18/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
12 12 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Tue 11/12 3:52 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Jason S. Jackson ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17874293.) filed by Mission First Tactical Group, Inc., Mission First Tactical, LLC.Declaration and Certificate of Service.(ANDREUZZI, LINDSAY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Ex A - Court Admissions of Jason Jackson
Sunday, November 10, 2024
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Sun 11/10 3:10 PM
Second MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Brian Mitchell, Esq. filed by Magpul Industries Corp.Order, Motion, Declaration, Certificate of Service.(BORDEN, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/06 3:50 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER OR MOTION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE 12 TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 12/12/24. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 11/6/24. 11/6/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
9 9 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/05 11:25 AM
ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/20/2024 02:30 PM IN Telephone Conference. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 11/5/24. 11/5/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/04 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LINDSAY ANDREUZZI on behalf of Mission First Tactical Group, Inc., Mission First Tactical, LLC with Certificate of Service(ANDREUZZI, LINDSAY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
misc Remark Wed 10/30 2:30 PM
DOC. NO. 7 MAILED TO UNREPS ON 10/30/2024. (md)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Mon 10/28 3:08 PM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF BRIAN E. MITCHELL IS DENIED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 10/28/24. 10/28/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Thu 10/24 3:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Selective Subpoena & Investigating Service, Inc. re: served Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet upon Gordon Edelman, President on behalf of Mission First Tactical, Inc. & Mission First Tactical, LLC by Corporation Service on October 22, 2024 (BORDEN, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
5 5 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 10/21 8:20 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including MIC Intermediate Holding Corp. by Magpul Industries Corp.(BORDEN, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 10/18 3:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Mission First Tactical Group, Inc., Mission First Tactical, LLC. (rf, )
Related: [-]
3 3 trial Exhibit Fri 10/18 2:55 PM
EXHIBIT A to Complaint by Magpul Industries Corp..(BORDEN, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B to Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit C to Complaint
2 2 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Fri 10/18 2:33 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian E. Mitchell, Esquire by Magpul Industries Corp. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17820876.). (BORDEN, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 10/18 2:17 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Mission First Tactical Group, Inc., Mission First Tactical, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17820704.), filed by Magpul Industries Corp.(BORDEN, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form