Connecticut District Court
Judge:Alvin W Thompson
Referred: Thomas O Farrish
Case #: 3:24-cv-01667
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 4:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Encore Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Alexander W. Ahrens
Melick & Porter, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
HDI Global Insurance Company
Represented By
Eric Andrew Duey
Blackburn & Donnelly, LLC
contact info
Michael R Marx
Denenberg Tuffley PLLC
contact info
Derek E. Donnelly
Law Office Of Stuart G. Blackburn
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, February 06, 2025
23 23 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 02/06 5:56 PM
Disclosure Statement RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Encore Holdings, LLC. (Ahrens, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order Thu 01/16 4:01 PM
ORDER: As set forth in the attached order, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report by September 17, 2025 . It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 1/16/2025. (Arone, J.)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order Thu 01/16 3:57 PM
ORDER: The parties' Rule 26(f) Report (ECF No.18 ) is hereby APPROVED. All discovery shall be completed by December 31, 2025. Dispositive motions will be filed on or before January 30, 2026. The court will issue a joint trial memorandum order after the dispositive motions deadline has passed. All other deadlines set forth in the report are approved. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 1/16/2025. (Arone, J.)
Related: [-]
20 20 minutes Status Conference Thu 01/16 3:44 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin W. Thompson: A telephonic Initial Planning Conference was held on January 16, 2025. Total Time: 4 minutes. (Court Reporter Alicia Cayode Kyles) (Arone, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Andrew Duey on behalf of HDI Global Insurance Company (Duey, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/13 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Initial Planning Conference set for 1/16/2025 at 3:30 PM before Judge Alvin W. Thompson via conference call. Dial-in instructions have been emailed to counsel of record. Anyone wishing to observe this proceeding should contact chambers at 860-240-3224 to request the dial-in instructions. (Arone, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
18 18 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 01/10 12:12 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Marx, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/20 3:43 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Encore Holdings, LLC.(Ahrens, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/18 9:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R Marx on behalf of HDI Global Insurance Company (Marx, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 11/18 11:52 AM
ORDER: The defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (ECF No.14 ) is hereby GRANTED. The defendant shall respond to the complaint by December 20, 2024 . It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/18/2024. (Arone, J.)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Wed 11/20 6:05 PM
Answer deadline updated for Encore Holdings, LLC to 12/20/2024. (Ferguson, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time Fri 11/15 4:28 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 20, 2024 to Respond to the Complaint.1 Complaint, by Encore Holdings, LLC. (Ahrens, Alexander)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/15 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander W. Ahrens on behalf of Encore Holdings, LLC (Ahrens, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/08 10:49 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Attorney Michael R. Marx, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 11/8/2024. (Mendez, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
11 11 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/07 11:09 AM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael R. Marx, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7961848) by HDI Global Insurance Company.(Donnelly, Derek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Visiting Attorney
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 11/07 11:03 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by HDI Global Insurance Company. Encore Holdings, LLC served on 10/28/2024, answer due 11/18/2024.(Donnelly, Derek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Supplemental Return
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 10/22 4:55 PM
Disclosure Statement Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HDI Global Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent HDI Global Network AG for HDI Global Insurance Company. (Donnelly, Derek)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
8 8 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 10/21 3:09 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Encore Holdings, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Derek E. Donnelly* *Law Office of Stuart G. Blackburn* *2 Concorde Way # 3C P.O. Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Electronic Service Documents Mon 10/21 3:06 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,5 Standing Protective Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,1 Complaint, filed by HDI Global Insurance Company,4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 10/21/2024.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
6 6 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Mon 10/21 3:05 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Mon 10/21 3:03 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/18/2024.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Electronic Filing Order Mon 10/21 3:01 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/18/2024.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Mon 10/21 2:59 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2024 Discovery due by 4/19/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 5/24/2025 Signed by Clerk on 10/18/2024.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Fri 10/18 5:30 PM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/18/2024.(Perez, J.)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/18 3:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Encore Holdings, LLC, d/b/a Encore Fire Protection ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7940963.), filed by HBI Global Insurance Company as subrogee of Aperam Stainless Services & Solutions USA, LLC..(Donnelly, Derek)
Related: [-]
service Request to Issue Summons Fri 10/18 3:53 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Encore Holdings, LLC, d/b/a Encore Fire Protection. (Donnelly, Derek)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 10/21 2:52 PM
Judge Alvin W. Thompson and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]