Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:James L Graham
Referred: Stephanie K Bowman
Case #: 2:24-cv-04081
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
13 13 order Related Case Memorandum Fri 04/25 2:47 PM
RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree thatcase number 2:24-cv-4256 & 2:25-cv-273 are related, but 2:24-cv-4081 is not. Therefore, the cases will remain as assigned to their respective Magistrate Judges. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 4/25/25. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/11 11:25 AM
MOTION for clarification from this Court as to status of Plaintiff's case by Plaintiff Kelvin R. Lovett. (kaw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
10 10 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Wed 02/19 2:46 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Kelvin R. Lovett. (mve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, December 27, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 12/27 8:39 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Kelvin R. Lovett. (er)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, December 26, 2024
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/30 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Filed Fees and Notice of Address Change. Filed by Plaintiff Kelvin R. Lovett (mve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, December 12, 2024
misc Filing Fee Received Thu 12/12 2:44 PM
Civil Filing fee received: $405, receipt number 200007999. (mas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Tue 12/10 2:01 PM
DEFICIENCY ORDER - Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay $405 or submit to the Court a completed Application and Affidavit By Incarcerated Person to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees form, including a "Certificate" page (page 8 of theApplication and Affidavit By Incarcerated Person to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees form that is used in this Court). The "Certificate" page must be completed and signed by the institutional cashier, and plaintiff must provide a certified copy of his prison trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the preceding six-month period within 30 days of the date of this Order. If plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court shall dismiss his case for want of prosecution . The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to provide plaintiff with an Application and Affidavit By Incarcerated Person to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees form. The Clerk of Court is further DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the cashier of the prison at which plaintiff is confined. Response to Order due by 1/9/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 12/10/2024. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 12/05 2:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Kelvin R. Lovett. (vb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
5 5 motion Appoint Counsel Thu 10/31 12:29 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel, by Plaintiff Kelvin R. Lovett. (vb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Deficiency (Prisoner Case) Fri 10/18 4:52 PM
Notice of Deficiency: The Court's docket reflects the initiation of the above referenced civil action. The initiating material contains the following deficiency(ies): Filing Fee Missing. The materials do not include the filing fee ($405) or a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (provided). (mve)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 10/18 4:48 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (mve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelopes
2 2 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 10/18 4:44 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Kelvin R. Lovett. (mve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelopes
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/18 4:39 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Kelvin R. Lovett. (mve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet