Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Lajuana M Counts
Case #: 4:24-cv-00684
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2024
Terminated:Feb 05, 2025
Case in other court:Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri, 2416-CV25493
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 3:36 AM CDT
Defendant
Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By
James C. Morrow
Morrow Willnauer Church Llc - Kcmo
contact info
Paeten Denning
Denning Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Ernest Parks
Represented By
Paeten Denning
Denning Law Firm
contact info
William Patrick Denning
Denning Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Linda Parks
Represented By
Paeten Denning
Denning Law Firm
contact info
William Patrick Denning
Denning Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
14 14 order Clerk's Order of Dismissal Wed 02/05 12:27 PM
Clerk's ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Chorny, Traci)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Filing Tue 02/04 11:59 AM
NOTICE of filing Dismissal With Prejudice by Ernest Parks, Linda Parks (Denning, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 11/27 1:26 PM
ORDER granting11 motion to stay and setting deadline for filing a stipulation of dismissal or a status report.Signed on November 27, 2024 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
11 11 motion Stay Tue 11/26 4:58 PM
MOTION to stay Proceedings filed by James C. Morrow on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/10/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Morrow, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment Fri 11/15 2:00 PM
SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to All Parties: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 12/6/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
10 10 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Wed 11/06 4:11 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Petition, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand filed by James C. Morrow on behalf of Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Morrow, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/28 3:35 PM
Defendant's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Morrow, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
notice Notice of Filing Fri 10/25 1:05 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/24 1:39 PM
NOTICE of appearance by William Patrick Denning on behalf of Ernest Parks, Linda Parks (Denning, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
7 7 order Rule 16 Notice Wed 10/23 4:26 PM
RULE 16 NOTICE/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Proposed scheduling order due on or before 12/10/2024. Rule 26 conference due by 11/26/2024. The parties are directed to review and comply with the Notice of Pretrial Procedures. Signed on October 23, 2024 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of MAPN Mon 10/21 4:14 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Crocker, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
notice Notice of Docket Modification Mon 10/21 4:00 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 10/18/2024 as Document No. 2, Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.'s Notice of Removal. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document. Documents have been attached to1 . This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Crocker, Susan)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment Mon 10/21 4:25 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiffs: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 11/12/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Crocker, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Fri 10/18 4:34 PM
NOTICE of filing of Notice of Removal with Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Morrow, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/18 4:26 PM
NOTICE of appearance by James C. Morrow on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Morrow, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/18 4:25 PM
NOTICE of appearance by James C. Morrow on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Morrow, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Removal Fri 10/18 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2416-CV25493, filed by James C. Morrow. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9257846. (Morrow, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 10/18 4:15 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2416-CV25493, filed by James C. Morrow. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9257846. (Morrow, James)
Related: [-]