California Northern District Court
Judge:Rita F Lin
Case #: 3:24-cv-07300
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause05:704 Labor Litigation
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2024
Case in other court:Contra Costa County Superior Court, C2402405
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 1:24 AM PDT
Defendant
Auto Warehousing Co.
Represented By
Shane Young
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Gregory G. Iskander
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Kaa Bao Ju
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mario B Brown
Represented By
Jovahn M Wiggins
Lavi & Ebrahimian, LLP
contact info
Jeffrey D. Klein
Lavi & Ebrahimian, LLP
contact info
Vincent Charles Granberry
Lavi & Ebrahimian, LLP
contact info
Joseph Lavi
Lavi & Ebrahimian, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, January 30, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 01/30 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Jeffrey D Klein on behalf of Mario B Brown (Klein, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 01/06 12:59 PM
ORDER by Judge Rita F. Lin granting 14 Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Mediation. Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2025. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/23/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
14 14 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 12/20 3:29 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY CASE PENDING MEDIATION filed by Mario B Brown. (Wiggins, Jovahn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 11/21 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Shane Young on behalf of Auto Warehousing Co. (Young, Shane)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
12 12 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 11/01 12:59 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Auto Warehousing Co. (Ju, Kaa Bao)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 10/28 9:21 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UPON REASSIGNMENT: Notice is hereby given that an Initial Case Management Conference is set before Judge Rita F. Lin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Lin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-rita-f-rfl/] . Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-rita-f-rfl/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 10/25 2:15 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Rita F. Lin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/25/2024.(exl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Fri 10/25 1:19 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 10/25 10:48 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mario B Brown.. (Wiggins, Jovahn)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 10/25 10:04 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Auto Warehousing Co. (Ju, Kaa Bao)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 10/21 12:10 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2025 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 10/21 9:36 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros and Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/4/2024. (exl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
4 4 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 10/18 5:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Auto Warehousing Co (Ju, Kaa Bao)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/18 5:15 PM
NOTICE by Auto Warehousing Co re Notice of Related Cases (Ju, Kaa Bao)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 10/18 4:59 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Auto Warehousing Co (Ju, Kaa Bao)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 10/18 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California County of Contra Costa. Their case number is C2402405, (Filing Fee: $405.00, receipt number ACANDC-19966920). Filed by Auto Warehousing Co.(Ju, Kaa Bao)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration of Kaa Bao Ju in Support of Defendant Auto Warehousing Co.'s Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court,
Att: 3 Declaration of Jacqueline Wihbey in Support of Defendant Auto Warehousing Co.'s Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court,
Att: 4 Declaration of Ian Mcrae in Support of Defendant Auto Warehousing Co.'s Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court
respoth Answer to Removal Complaint Mon 10/21 12:06 PM
Answer to Removal Complaint Related [+] by Auto Warehousing Co.. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] fer to docket [1-2], page 42