Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joseph F Leeson, Jr
Case #: 5:24-cv-05543
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
GREATER LEHIGH VALLEY MULTIPLE LISTING SERVICE (GLVMLS)
Represented By
JAMES J. SCANLON
Norris Mclaughlin, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS (NAR)
Represented By
JAMES J. SCANLON
Norris Mclaughlin, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
PENNSYLVANIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS (PAR)
Represented By
JAMES J. SCANLON
Norris Mclaughlin, P.A.
contact info
ASHLEY L. TARAGNA
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
WILLIAM H. CATTO
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Defendant
ALLYSON LYSAGHT
Represented By
JAMES J. SCANLON
Norris Mclaughlin, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10 (UNKNOWN PARTIES)
Plaintiff
MAURICE MUHAMMAD
1544 HAMILTON STREET
ALLENTOWN, PA 18102
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
JANE DOE 1
Terminated: 02/23/2025
Defendant
KIM LUCAS MANTZ
Terminated: 02/23/2025
Defendant
ROB MCCANN
Terminated: 02/23/2025
Defendant
PAUL MYERS
Terminated: 02/23/2025
(COMMITTEE MEMBER) NATIONAL BATTERY P.O. BOX 1703
MERCHANTVILLE, NJ 08109
Defendant
MELANIE ONESTO
Terminated: 02/23/2025
Defendant
JUSTIN POREMBO
Terminated: 02/23/2025
Represented By
JAMES J. SCANLON
Norris Mclaughlin, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
RICHARD BRENT SOMACH
Terminated: 02/23/2025
Defendant
RASOUL WILSON
Terminated: 02/23/2025
Defendant
SANYAE WILSON
Terminated: 02/23/2025


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
60 60 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/03 10:52 AM
PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS54 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by MAURICE MUHAMMAD.(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Page
Saturday, March 29, 2025
59 59 service Affidavit of Service Mon 03/31 10:29 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service upon Department of Justice (DOJ) by CERTIFIED MAIL on 3/1/25(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Cover Page
58 58 service Affidavit of Service Mon 03/31 10:26 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service upon Federal Trade Commission (FTC) by CERTIFIED MAIL on 3/1/25(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Cover Page
57 57 service Affidavit of Service Mon 03/31 10:22 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service upon Housing Urban Developement (HUD) by CERTIFIED MAIL on 3/1/25(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Cover page
Friday, March 28, 2025
56 56 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/28 12:51 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re54 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by GREATER LEHIGH VALLEY MULTIPLE LISTING SERVICE (GLVMLS), ALLYSON LYSAGHT, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS (NAR), PENNSYLVANIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS (PAR), JUSTIN POREMBO. (SCANLON, JAMES)
Related: [-]