Arkansas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Bianca M Rucker
Case #: 2:24-bk-71734
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Bone Construction Company, Inc.
7800 Collier St
Fort Smith, AR 72916-6012
Represented By
Marc Honey
Honey Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee (ust)
Office of U.S. Trustee 200 W Capitol, Ste. 1200
Little Rock, AR 72201


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 12:01 PM CDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
58 58 misc Operating Report Mon 04/28 2:07 PM
Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 03/01/2025-03/31/2025 filed by Marc Honey Debtor Bone Construction Company, Inc.. (Honey, Marc)
Related: [-]