Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Sara E Hill
Case #: 4:24-cv-00501
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 3:35 AM CDT
Defendant
SAS Retail Services, LLC
Represented By
Jonathan Gary Rector
Littler Mendelson Pc (dallas)
contact info
Jessica L. Craft
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Kandice Irby
Represented By
Antonio Jeffrey
Jeffrey Law Office, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, January 27, 2025
28 28 order 01 - Order Case - Stayed Ruling on Motion to Stay Mon 01/27 4:23 PM
ORDER by Judge Sara E Hill ; staying case; granting19 Motion to Stay (lmc, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
27 27 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Thu 01/23 3:13 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Daymon Worldwide Inc. for SAS Retail Services, LLC ) by SAS Retail Services, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] ctor, Jonathan
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
26 26 order 02 - Minute Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Wed 01/22 1:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Sara E Hill - Defendant SAS Retail Services, LLC was previously ordered to file a disclosure statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1 [ECF No. 14], but Defendant has not complied with that order. Defendant is hereby ORDERED to file a disclosure statement forthwith. Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
Related: [-] 14 Minute Order,, Directing Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement,
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/21 2:12 PM
NOTICE Amended Joint Notice of Authority in Support of Joint Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration Related [+] by SAS Retail Services, LLC (With attachments) (Craft, Jessica)
Related: [-] 19 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration ,23 Order,
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/21 10:22 AM
NOTICE Joint Notice of Authority in Support of Joint Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration Related [+] by SAS Retail Services, LLC (Craft, Jessica)
Related: [-] 19 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration ,23 Order,
Monday, January 13, 2025
23 23 order 01 - Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Mon 01/13 2:50 PM
ORDER by Judge Sara E Hill Related [+] (ll, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 19 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration
Thursday, January 09, 2025
22 22 order 02 - Minute Order Case - Assigned to District Judge (declination of consent only) Case - Number Changed Thu 01/09 8:39 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , assigning this case to a district judge. Assigning case to District Judge Sara E Hill and Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele, changing case number to 24-cv-00501-SEH-MTS (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
21 21 misc Joint Status Report per LCvR16-1(b)(1) Wed 01/08 1:03 PM
Partial JOINT STATUS REPORT by SAS Retail Services, LLC (Craft, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
20 20 order 01 - Order Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report Tue 12/31 12:41 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele (partial joint status report due) , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 1/8/2025) (MTS1, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
19 19 motion Stay Mon 12/30 2:47 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration by SAS Retail Services, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] ctor, Jonathan
Friday, December 20, 2024
18 18 order 01 - Order Directing - Party to Show Cause Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 12/20 2:32 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele , directing Plaintiff and Defendant to show cause( Response to Order to Show Cause due by 12/30/2024) Related [+] (MTS1, Chambers)
Related: [-] 15 Order, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
17 17 order 02 - Minute Order Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 12/11 10:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Docket No. 16) is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond no later than January 3, 2025. No further extensions will be granted. ; granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
16 16 motion Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/10 3:24 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead) Related [+] by SAS Retail Services, LLC (Craft, Jessica)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
15 15 order 01 - Order Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report Wed 11/27 2:51 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/18/2024) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Tue 11/19 8:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing SAS Retail Services, LLC to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (cjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
order 02 - Minute Order Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 11/18 11:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Docket No. 11) is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond no later than December 13, 2024 ; granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer
Friday, November 15, 2024
12 12 notice Appearance - Attorney Fri 11/15 4:10 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jessica L. Craft on behalf of SAS Retail Services, LLC [Note: Attorney Jessica L. Craft added to party SAS Retail Services, LLC (pty:dft).] (Craft, Jessica)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to Answer Fri 11/15 3:22 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Related [+] by SAS Retail Services, LLC
Related: [-] 2 Complaint ctor, Jonathan
10 10 notice Appearance - Attorney Fri 11/15 3:12 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jonathan Gary Rector on behalf of SAS Retail Services, LLC [Note: Attorney Jonathan Gary Rector added to party SAS Retail Services, LLC (pty:dft).] Related [+]
Related: [-] ctor, Jonathan
Thursday, October 31, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Thu 10/31 11:05 AM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to SAS Retail Services, LLC (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Appearance - Attorney Thu 10/31 5:44 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Antonio Jeffrey on behalf of Kandice Irby (Jeffrey, Antonio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
7 7 misc Filing Fee Paid in Full Tue 10/22 10:18 AM
FILING FEES Paid in Full (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Mon 10/21 1:57 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kandice Irby (Jeffrey, Antonio)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
5 5 misc Letter re: Local Counsel Requirement Fri 10/18 4:29 PM
LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Antonio Jeffrey (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
4 4 order 15 - Notice of Assignment of Case to MJ Fri 10/18 4:26 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Fri 10/18 4:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Kandice Irby to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 10/18 4:15 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against SAS Retail Services, LLC by Kandice Irby (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 10/18 4:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kandice Irby (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]