Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:24-cr-01232
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 19, 2024 2:33 AM CDT
Defendant
Rene Gonzalez (1)
Represented By
Raul Guerra
Federal Public Defender, Southern District Of Texas
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Christina Arellano-Villarreal
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jose Homero Ramirez
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/19/2024 3:58 AM CDT
Monday, September 23, 2024
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Rene Gonzalez (1), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 9/24/2024 at 09:35 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos (mtl5) [5:24-mj-01237]
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Rene Gonzalez, filed. (mtl5) [5:24-mj-01237]
Related: [-]
3 3 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on September 23, 2024 at 09:37 AM as to Rene Gonzalez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mtl5) [5:24-mj-01237]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Rene Gonzalez. Attorney Federal Public Defender - Laredo for Rene Gonzalez added. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01237]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to Rene Gonzalez held on 9/24/2024. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Order appointing Federal Public Defender. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. No bond set. Court issued oral order regarding prosecutorial obligations under Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4. All parties appeared in person. Defendant sworn in. Defendant submitted written waiver of Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearings to the Court. Termination of hearings to follow accordingly. Appearances: Leslie Cortez AUSA; FPD Ramon Villafranca Jr. (on duty); USPO: Brenda Garza ; USM: Deputy Alexis Contreras. (Opened/Adjourned: 9:25 AM - 9:50 AM) (ERO: Emmanuel Garcia) (Interpreter: Raul Gonzalez, not used) Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 10/1/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01237]
Related: [-]
**Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Rene Gonzalez: Prelim Exam and Detention Hrg terminated. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01237]
Related: [-]
4 4 COMPLAINT accepted by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos as to Rene Gonzalez, filed. Agent: Adrian Davila (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01237]
Related: [-]
5 5 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Rene Gonzalez, filed. (akp5). [5:24-mj-01237]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01237]
Related: [-]
7 7 BRADY AND FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE ORDER on Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4 as to Rene Gonzalez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01237]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Rene Gonzalez. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 10/1/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01237]
Related: [-]
9 9 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Rene Gonzalez. Detention Hearing set for 10/1/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01237]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination by Rene Gonzalez, filed. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01237]
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER of Detention Hearing in the case of Rene Gonzalez, filed. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01237]
Related: [-]
12 12 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Rene Gonzalez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01237]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Raul Guerra, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Rene Gonzalez, filed. (Guerra, Raul) [5:24-mj-01237]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
13 13 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Rene Gonzalez. NOTICE: Document available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter CM/ECF Filer login and password first for authentication. Be sure to SAVE the document locally at the time of viewing , filed. (jb5) [5:24-mj-01237]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Jose Homero Ramirez appearing for USA, filed. (Ramirez, Jose) [5:24-mj-01237]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
14 14 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Rene Gonzalez (1) count(s) 1, filed. (tat5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment