California Central District Court
Judge:Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 5:24-cv-02180
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2024
Terminated:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 2:16 AM PDT
Defendant
Joel S. Agron
Defendant
Fields
Defendant
Guerrero
Defendant
Honorable Justice Millier
Defendant
Ramirez
Defendant
Lisa M. Rogan
Defendant
Steven J. Singley
Plaintiff
Beatrice M. Uwamariya
11055 Alamo Rd.
Loma Linda, CA 92354


Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
9 9 order Appoint Counsel Wed 10/30 3:53 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AS MOOT [DKT. 3] by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Because the Court denied the IFP request and dismissed this action, Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel is denied as moot. [Dkt.3 ]. [See document for further information.] (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
8 8 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Tue 10/29 10:40 AM
ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes Denying4 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: As explained in the attached statement, the Request is DENIED because: The District Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. The action seeks monetary relief against defendant(s) immune from such relief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: As explained in the attached statement, because it is absolutely clear that the deficiencies in the complaint cannot be cured by amendment, this case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
7 7 order Transferring Case (Related Case)(CV-34) Thu 10/24 10:58 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:24-cv-02177 SSS(SPx). Case transferred from Judge Mark C. Scarsi to Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:24-cv-02180 SSS(AS). Signed by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes (rn)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Fri 10/18 4:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/21 12:16 PM
SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS filed by Plaintiff Beatrice M. Uwamariya. (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Fri 10/18 4:51 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Beatrice M. Uwamariya. (lh)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appointment of Counsel Fri 10/18 4:48 PM
REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Beatrice M. Uwamariya. (lh)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 10/18 4:45 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Beatrice M. Uwamariya, (lh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Referred) Fri 10/18 4:43 PM
COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Joel S. Agron, Fields, Guerrero, Millier, Ramirez, Lisa M. Rogan, Steven J. Singley. Case assigned to Judge Mark C. Scarsi and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Filed by Plaintiff Beatrice M. Uwamariya. (lh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet