California Central District Court
Judge:James V Selna
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:24-cv-02271
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2024
Terminated:Oct 23, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 1:31 AM PDT
Defendant
Kimberly Sutherland
Represented By
Ray Edwin Gallo
Gallo LLP
contact info
James Mark Moore
Gallo LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael Sutherland
Represented By
Ray Edwin Gallo
Gallo LLP
contact info
James Mark Moore
Gallo LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ILYM Group, Inc.
Represented By
Douglas B Vanderpool
Vanderpool Law Firm
contact info
Michael J Fairchild
Vanderpool Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
8 8 1 pgs notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 10/23 2:13 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 10/23 2:13 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 10/23 2:12 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
5 5 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 10/21 11:05 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff ILYM Group, Inc.. Dismissal is without. (Fairchild, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 10/18 6:37 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Michael Sutherland, Kimberly Sutherland, (Moore, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 10/18 6:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Michael Sutherland, Kimberly Sutherland. (Moore, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration Fri 10/18 6:33 PM
DECLARATION of J. Mark Moore re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendants Michael Sutherland, Kimberly Sutherland.(Moore, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
1 1 8 pgs notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 10/18 6:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2024 01426611-CU-BT-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-38428711 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Kimberly Sutherland, Michael Sutherland. (Attorney James Mark Moore added to party Michael Sutherland(pty:dft), Attorney James Mark Moore added to party Kimberly Sutherland(pty:dft))(Moore, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 State Court Summons,
Att: 3 State Court Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 State Court Receipt,
Att: 5 State Court Notice of CMC,
Att: 6 State Court Certificate of Mailing