Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen J Murphy, III
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 2:24-cv-12720
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2024
Terminated:Jan 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 6:39 AM EDT
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Village of Beverly Hills Police
Plaintiff
Joshua Kalchert
2844 Livernois Rd #854
Troy, MI 48099


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, February 06, 2025
6 6 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/06 1:14 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Village of Beverly Hills Police served on 1/10/2025, answer due 1/31/2025. (CShr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
5 5 order Dismissing Case Mon 01/27 1:23 PM
ORDER Granting2 IFP Application and Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Mon 01/27 1:24 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re5 Order Dismissing Case, mailed to Joshua Kalchert, at 2844 Livernois Rd #854, Troy, MI 48099 (RLou)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
4 4 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Mon 10/21 10:36 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (LGra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
3 3 notice Plaintiff's Notice Waiving Service by U.S. Marshal Fri 10/18 2:14 PM
Plaintiff's Notice Waiving Service by U.S. Marshal by Joshua Kalchert (SSch)
Related: [-]
2 2 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Fri 10/18 2:13 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Joshua Kalchert. (SSch)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Fri 10/18 2:12 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Joshua Kalchert against John Doe, Village of Beverly Hills Police (SSch)
Related: [-]