Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Brandy R Mcmillion
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:24-cv-12737
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2024
Terminated:Nov 18, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Bad Boy Records
Defendant
Sean Combs
Defendant
Warren Evans
Defendant
Robert Ficano
Defendant
Patrick Jackman
Defendant
Patricia Penman
Defendant
Kym Worthy
Plaintiff
Derrick Lee Cardello-Smith
267009 EARNEST C. BROOKS CORRECTIONAL FACILITY 2500 S. SHERIDAN DRIVE
MUSKEGON HEIGHTS, MI 49444

GPO Nov 18 2024
OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 10, 2025
18 18 notice Notice - Other Mon 03/10 11:06 AM
NOTICE of intent to re-open case and file and amended complaint with the filing fee by Derrick Lee Cardello-Smith (DPer)
Related: [-]
17 17 8 pgs misc Affidavit Mon 03/10 11:05 AM
AFFIDAVIT Suzette Samuels by Derrick Lee Cardello-Smith (DPer)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
16 16 3 pgs misc Affidavit Fri 01/24 2:40 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Marcus Ashford by Derrick Lee Cardello-Smith. (JHea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
15 15 misc Statement - free Wed 01/08 3:11 PM
STATEMENT as to the Case Only Being About the Breach of Contract and Nothing Else Before This Court by Derrick Lee Cardello-Smith. (JHea)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Statement - free Wed 01/08 1:19 PM
STATEMENT as to the Case Only Being About the Breach of Contract and Nothing Else Before This Court by Derrick Lee Cardello-Smith. (JHea)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
13 13 notice Notice - Other Mon 01/06 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Submission of Receipt of $150,000 Deposit by Derrick Lee Cardello-Smith. (JHea)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
12 12 notice Notice - Other Mon 12/23 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Companion case 24-13245 Docket Sheet and Pleadings. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
11 11 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Thu 11/21 4:23 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Derrick Lee Cardello-Smith. (JPar)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Judgment* Mon 11/18 9:21 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
9 9 5 pgs order Memorandum Opinion & Order Mon 11/18 9:19 AM
OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Mon 11/18 9:23 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re9 Opinion & Order,10 Judgment mailed to Derrick Lee Cardello-Smith #267009, EARNEST C. BROOKS CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 2500 S. SHERIDAN DRIVE, MUSKEGON HEIGHTS, MI 49444. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
8 8 11 pgs misc Affidavit Fri 11/15 10:38 AM
AFFIDAVIT of George Preston by Derrick Lee Cardello-Smith (JPar)
Related: [-]
7 7 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Thu 11/14 2:52 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Derrick Lee Cardello-Smith. (JHea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 3 pgs notice Notice - Other Thu 11/14 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Removal by Derrick Lee Cardello-Smith (JPar)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order Fri 10/25 3:19 PM
ORDER Regarding Code Assignment. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (JHea)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Fri 10/25 3:29 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re5 Order mailed to Derrick Lee Cardello-Smith #267009, EARNEST C. BROOKS CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 2500 S. SHERIDAN DRIVE, MUSKEGON HEIGHTS, MI 49444. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
4 4 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Mon 10/21 1:35 PM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (LGra)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
3 3 1 pgs notice Filing Fee Not Paid* Fri 10/18 10:17 AM
Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 11/1/2024 (SSch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
1 1 26 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Fri 10/18 10:16 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Derrick Lee Cardello-Smith against Bad Boy Records, Sean Combs, Warren Evans, Robert Ficano, Patrick Jackman, Patricia Penman, Kym Worthy (SSch)
Related: [-]