Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Mark A Kearney
Case #: 2:24-cv-05559
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2024
Re-opened:Apr 29, 2025
Terminated:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 4:20 AM EDT
Defendant
TINA GARZILLO
Represented By
ANDREW M. RONGAUS
Siana Law
contact info
Theodore T Speedy, Jr
Siana Law
contact info
Defendant
ANTHONY HAMADAY
Represented By
ANDREW M. RONGAUS
Siana Law
contact info
Theodore T Speedy, Jr
Siana Law
contact info
Defendant
WILLIAM JENAWAY
Represented By
ANDREW M. RONGAUS
Siana Law
contact info
Theodore T Speedy, Jr
Siana Law
contact info
Defendant
CAROLE KENNEY
Represented By
ANDREW M. RONGAUS
Siana Law
contact info
Theodore T Speedy, Jr
Siana Law
contact info
Defendant
GREG PHILIPS
Represented By
ANDREW M. RONGAUS
Siana Law
contact info
Theodore T Speedy, Jr
Siana Law
contact info
Defendant
UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP
Represented By
ANDREW M. RONGAUS
Siana Law
contact info
Theodore T Speedy, Jr
Siana Law
contact info
Defendant
UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS
Represented By
ANDREW M. RONGAUS
Siana Law
contact info
Theodore T Speedy, Jr
Siana Law
contact info
Defendant
GREG WAKS
Represented By
ANDREW M. RONGAUS
Siana Law
contact info
Theodore T Speedy, Jr
Siana Law
contact info
Plaintiff
BILLY BOY CONSTRUCTION LLC
Represented By
ROBERT T. VANCE, JR.
Law Offices Of Robert T Vance Jr
contact info
Plaintiff
BILLY BOY REAL ESTATE LLC
Represented By
ROBERT T. VANCE, JR.
Law Offices Of Robert T Vance Jr
contact info
Plaintiff
EDDIE HENDRICK
Represented By
ROBERT T. VANCE, JR.
Law Offices Of Robert T Vance Jr
contact info

GPO Apr 30 2025
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' 24 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE FEDERAL DUE PROCESS AND EQUAL PROTECTION CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THE STATE LAW ABUSE OF PROCESS AND TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/30/25. 5/1/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED. (fdc)
GPO May 01 2025
MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 5/1/2025. 5/1/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(uh)

Docket last updated: 68 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
31 31 28 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Thu 05/01 4:28 PM
MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 5/1/2025. 5/1/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(uh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Wed 04/30 4:28 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS'24 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE FEDERAL DUE PROCESS AND EQUAL PROTECTION CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THE STATE LAW ABUSE OF PROCESS AND TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/30/25. 5/1/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED. (fdc)
Related: [-]
29 29 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/30 12:46 PM
ORDER THAT THE CAPTION IS AMENDED TO REFLECT THE PROPER ENTITY PLAINTIFF AS BILLY BOY CONTRACTING LLC AS OPPOSED TO BILLY BOY CONSTRUCTION LLC. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/30/25. 4/30/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
28 28 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/25 3:51 PM
ORDERED PLAINTIFFS SHALL, ON OR BEFORE APRIL 29, 2025, FILE A STIPULATION TO AMEND THE CAPTION TO REFLECT THE PROPER ENTITIES, OR SHOW CAUSE IN A MEMORANDUM, NOT EXCEEDING THREE PAGES, AS TO WHY WE SHOULD NOT AMEND THE CAPTION TO REFLECT THE PROPER ENTITY PLAINTIFF AS BILLY BOY CONTRACTING, LLC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/25/2025. 4/25/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/24 12:05 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BILLY BOY CONSTRUCTION LLC, BILLY BOY REAL ESTATE LLC, EDDIE HENDRICK.(VANCE, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Answer to Defendants Statement of Undisputed Material Facts,
Att: 3 Memorandum
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
26 26 order Order on Motion to Modify Tue 04/22 10:26 AM
Text ORDER, finding limited good cause for a two day extension without affecting trial obligations, GRANTING25 uncontested MOTION TO MODIFY our March 27, 2025 ORDER19 only to grant Plaintiff leave to file a compliant Opposition to the pending Motion for summary judgment24 by no later than April 23, 2025.SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON April 22,2025. April 22, 2025 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(KEARNEY, MARK)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/22 10:30 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to24 MOTION for Summary Judgment . RESPONSES DUE BY 4/23/2025. (uh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
25 25 motion Modify Mon 04/21 9:43 PM
Consent MOTION to Modify March 27, 2025 Order filed by BILLY BOY CONSTRUCTION LLC, BILLY BOY REAL ESTATE LLC, EDDIE HENDRICK..(VANCE, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 10, 2025
24 24 motion Summary Judgment Thu 04/10 11:39 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TINA GARZILLO, ANTHONY HAMADAY, WILLIAM JENAWAY, CAROLE KENNEY, GREG PHILIPS, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS.Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgement, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgement,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
23 23 misc Statement Thu 04/10 5:01 PM
Statement re Appendix of Exhibits by TINA GARZILLO, ANTHONY HAMADAY, WILLIAM JENAWAY, CAROLE KENNEY, GREG PHILIPS, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, GREG WAKS. (RONGAUS, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Statement Thu 04/10 4:47 PM
Statement of Undisputed Material Facts for Defendants by TINA GARZILLO, ANTHONY HAMADAY, WILLIAM JENAWAY, CAROLE KENNEY, GREG PHILIPS, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, GREG WAKS.(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
21 21 misc Statement Thu 04/10 4:39 PM
Statement of Undisputed Material Facts for Defendants by TINA GARZILLO, ANTHONY HAMADAY, WILLIAM JENAWAY, CAROLE KENNEY, GREG PHILIPS, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, GREG WAKS.(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix with Exhibits,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Monday, April 07, 2025
20 20 minutes Settlement Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 04/08 11:26 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY Settlement Conference held on 4/7/2025. (sg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 03/28 9:27 AM
ORDER THAT THE PARTIES' JOINT18 MOTION TO AMEND THE 1/8/25 SCHEDULING ORDER14 IS GRANTED IN PART REQUIRING THE 1/8/25 ORDER14 BE AMENDED ONLY AT PARAGRAPH 11 GRANTING THE PARTIES LEAVE TO FILE DISPOSITION AND RULE 702 MOTIONS NO LATER THAN 4/10/25 WITH RESPONSES DUE BY 4/21/25 WITHOUT OTHERWISE ALTERING THE PARTIES' OBLIGATIONS UNDER THE 1/8/25 ORDER14 . SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 3/27/25.3/8/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/31 8:42 AM
Per Order #19 : MOTIONS DUE BY 4/10/2025. (lisad, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 03/27 2:18 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions and Response filed by TINA GARZILLO, ANTHONY HAMADAY, WILLIAM JENAWAY, CAROLE KENNEY, GREG PHILIPS, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, GREG WAKS.Certificate of Service.(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 01/22 1:26 PM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/7/2025 01:30 PM IN Video Conference BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 1/22/2025. 1/22/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/22 9:17 AM
NOTICE FROM CHAMBERS OF JUDGE HEY, RE: SETTLEMENT. (sg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
15 15 misc Stipulation Thu 01/16 9:50 AM
STIPULATION of Undisputed Facts by BILLY BOY REAL ESTATE LLC, BILLY BOY CONSTRUCTION LLC, EDDIE HENDRICK. (VANCE, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
14 14 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 01/08 3:32 PM
ORDER THAT A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/23/2025 08:45 AM IN Video Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY., DISCOVERY DUE BY 3/28/2025., JURY SELECTION SET FOR 5/27/2025 09:00 AM IN Courtroom 6B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY., MOTIONS DUE BY 4/2/2025., MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 5/14/2025., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 4/2/2025., PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 5/12/2025., DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 5/12/2025., TRIAL DATE SET FOR 5/27/2025 09:00 AM IN Courtroom 6B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/8/2025. 1/8/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
13 13 minutes Telephone Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 01/08 12:15 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY Telephone Conference held on 1/8/2025 (sg)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 01/06 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: INITIAL PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/8/2025 AT 08:30 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY. (CALL IN INFORMATION: 1-646-828-7666; MEETING ID: 160 086 4474; PASSCODE: 038361)(uh)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 05, 2025
11 11 order Pretrial Order Sun 01/05 7:19 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER adjourning the January 6, 2025 initial pretrial conference under our December 10, 2024 Order9 beginning the ninety day discovery period given the closing of the Court based on a weather emergency until 8:30 AM on Wednesday, January 8, 2025 with counsel separately notified on January 6, 2025 as to the logistics for the January 8, 2025 conference over zoom.gov. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON January 5, 2025. January 5, 2025 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(KEARNEY, MARK)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
10 10 misc Report Of Fri 01/03 2:27 PM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by BILLY BOY REAL ESTATE LLC, BILLY BOY CONSTRUCTION LLC, EDDIE HENDRICK. (VANCE, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 12/10 8:38 AM
ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/6/2025 08:45 AM IN Video Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/9/2024. 12/10/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 12/09 1:57 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to3 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by CAROLE KENNEY, ANTHONY HAMADAY, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, TINA GARZILLO, WILLIAM JENAWAY, GREG WAKS, GREG PHILIPS.(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/09 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore T Speedy, Jr on behalf of CAROLE KENNEY, ANTHONY HAMADAY, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, TINA GARZILLO, WILLIAM JENAWAY, GREG WAKS, GREG PHILIPS with Certificate of Service(Speedy, Theodore)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/09 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW M. RONGAUS on behalf of CAROLE KENNEY, ANTHONY HAMADAY, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, TINA GARZILLO, WILLIAM JENAWAY, GREG WAKS, GREG PHILIPS with Certificate of Service(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Wed 11/20 5:23 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Linda Simpkins re: served Summons and Amended Complaint upon Upper Merion Township by Personal Service on November 18, 2024 (VANCE, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 10/25 9:03 AM
Summons Issued as to TINA GARZILLO, ANTHONY HAMADAY, WILLIAM JENAWAY, CAROLE KENNEY, GREG PHILIPS, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, GREG WAKS. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 10/25/2024 (sg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/23 9:50 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by EDDIE HENDRICK, BILLY BOY CONSTRUCTION LLC, BILLY BOY REAL ESTATE LLC.(VANCE, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A-D
Monday, October 21, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 10/21 9:24 AM
Summons Issued as to TINA GARZILLO, ANTHONY HAMADAY, WILLIAM JENAWAY, CAROLE KENNEY, GREG PHILIPS, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP, UPPER MERION TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, GREG WAKS. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 10/21/2024 (sg)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 20, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Sun 10/20 6:24 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17821926.), filed by EDDIE HENDRICK, BILLY BOY CONSTRUCTION LLC, BILLY BOY REAL ESTATE LLC.(VANCE, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A-B