Tennessee Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00074
Case Filed:Jul 23, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 21, 2024 3:20 AM EDT
Defendant
John David Pickard, Jr. (1)
Represented By
J Damon Burk
Federal Defender Services Of Eastern Tennessee, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Kimberly Ann Wehunt (2)
Represented By
Martin Wayne Lester
Martin W. Lester, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Russ Swafford
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Feb 04 2025
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Kimberly Ann Wehunt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Dumitru on 2/4/2025. (CNC)
GPO Feb 19 2025
ORDER accepting and adopting 34 Report and Recommendations on Plea of Guilty as to Kimberly Ann Wehunt (2). Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr. on 2/19/2025. (AML)
GPO Feb 19 2025
ORDER accepting and adopting 34 Report and Recommendations on Plea of Guilty as to Kimberly Ann Wehunt (2). Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr. on 2/19/2025. (AML)
GPO Mar 05 2025
ORDER accepting and adopting 38 Report and Recommendations on Plea of Guilty as to John David Pickard Jr. (1). Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr. on 3/5/2025. (AML)

Docket last updated: 10/21/2024 3:30 AM EDT
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
1 1 SEALED MOTION to Seal Case by USA. Modified on 8/23/2024 to edit text. (AWS)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting 1 Motion to Seal Case as to John David Pickard Jr. (1), Kimberly Ann Wehunt (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7/23/2024. (CNC)
Related: [-]
3 3 INDICTMENT as to John David Pickard, Jr (1) count(s) 1-5, Kimberly Ann Wehunt (2) count(s) 1-2, 4.(CNC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet
4 4 Sealed Document- Unredacted Indictment (CNC)
Related: [-]