Original Case: 1:22-cv-00099

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-01935
Typecivil / private / diversity
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2023
Terminated:Oct 18, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 21, 2024 5:11 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellant
HERBERT BOXER
Represented By
Mark Roy Bendure
Bendure & Thomas
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
MARIAN BOXER
Represented By
Mark Roy Bendure
Bendure & Thomas
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
HOME-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Kaitlyn Adell Cramer
Novara Tesija Catenacci McDonald & Baas
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/21/2024 5:11 AM CDT
Friday, October 20, 2023
The case manager for this case is: Mr. Roy G. Ford (513) 564-7016 (RGF)
Related: [-]
Update fee status change to paid.APPEAL FEE PAID re [39] by defendants Herbert Boxer, Marian Boxer in the amount of $505, receipt number AMIWDC-7194377 (Bendure, Mark) (RGF)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Herbert Boxer and Marian Boxer. Transcript needed: n. (RGF)
Related: [-]
6 pgs BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 11/29/2023;. appellee brief due 12/29/2023; (RGF)
Related: [-]