New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:24-cv-07987
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Other
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Axos Bank
4350 La Jolla Village Drive Suite 140
San Diego, CA 92122
Represented By
Katherine Anne Boy Skipsey
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
John Landry
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Polly Towill
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By
Casey Devin Laffey
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Pamela Lauren Schoenberg
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Casey Joseph Olbrantz
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Titan Capital ID, LLC
140 E 45th Street
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Marion Ramsey Harris
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Daniel John Pohlman
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 84 minutes ago
Friday, March 28, 2025
50 50 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 03/28 8:48 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:33 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . . Document filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation..(Laffey, Casey)
Related: [-]
49 49 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 03/28 5:30 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:36 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . . Document filed by Axos Bank..(Towill, Polly)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
48 48 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 03/24 11:13 AM
ORDER granting47 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File The requests are granted. The deadline for Defendants to file their replies is extended to March 28, 2025, and FDIC-R may file a memorandum of law of 11 pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/21/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 03/24 11:14 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/28/2025 (jca)
Related: [-]