Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael J Newman
Referred: Caroline H Gentry
Case #: 3:24-cv-00277
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 4:49 AM EDT
Defendant
Luxury Pool Concepts, LLC
Defendant
James Weaver
Plaintiff
SCP Distributors LLC
Represented By
Michael Shane Fitzgerald
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Colin D Dougherty
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Brett A. Berman
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info

GPO Nov 25 2024
ORDER: (1) STAYING THIS CASE AS RELATED TO DEFENDANT JAMES WEAVER UNDER 11 U.S.C. § 362(a); (2) REQUIRING PLAINTIFF SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC TO FILE A STATUS REPORT EVERY SIX MONTHS BEGINNING ON JANUARY 23, 2025; (3) REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO NOTIFY THE COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS AFTER THE BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS ARE RESOLVED; AND (4) REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO NOTIFY THE COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS IF THIS CASE BECOMES MOOT AS A RESULT OF THE BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 11/25/2024. (acw)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, March 07, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order Fri 03/07 3:58 PM
ORDER FINDING PLAINTIFF SATISFIED THE SHOW CAUSE ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 3/7/2025. (acw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
17 17 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 03/06 11:49 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff SCP Distributors LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-LLC Filings
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 02/26 9:49 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE ON OR BEFORE MARCH 19, 2025. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 2/26/2025. (acw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
15 15 motion Default Judgment (Motion for) Wed 01/29 11:01 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant, Luxury Pool Concepts, LLC by Plaintiff SCP Distributors LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Declaration of Courtney Barrios,
Att: 3 Declaration of Colin D. Dougherty
Thursday, January 23, 2025
14 14 misc Status Report Thu 01/23 11:44 AM
STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff SCP Distributors LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
13 13 order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 12/19 8:40 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Luxury Pool Concepts, LLC (acw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
12 12 notice Application to Enter Default Tue 12/17 3:22 PM
Application to Clerk for entry of default against Luxury Pool Concepts, LLC . (Dougherty, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of C. Dougherty
Monday, November 25, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Staying Case ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 11/25 4:48 PM
ORDER: (1) STAYING THIS CASE AS RELATED TO DEFENDANT JAMES WEAVER UNDER 11 U.S.C. § 362(a); (2) REQUIRING PLAINTIFF SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC TO FILE A STATUS REPORT EVERY SIX MONTHS BEGINNING ON JANUARY 23, 2025; (3) REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO NOTIFY THE COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS AFTER THE BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS ARE RESOLVED; AND (4) REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO NOTIFY THE COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS IF THIS CASE BECOMES MOOT AS A RESULT OF THE BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 11/25/2024. (acw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
10 10 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy Thu 11/21 12:52 PM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Defendant James Weaver by Plaintiff SCP Distributors LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Bankruptcy Petition
Thursday, November 07, 2024
9 9 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/07 2:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10242570) of Michael Fitzgerald by Plaintiff SCP Distributors LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing
8 8 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/07 2:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10242559) of Brett A. Berman by Plaintiff SCP Distributors LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/07 3:13 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brett A. Berman. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing privileges through PACER if they have not done so already. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 11/7/2024. (acw)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/07 3:33 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael Shane Fitzgerald as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 11/7/2024. (srb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/31 10:20 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant James Weaver. James Weaver served on 10/23/2024, answer due 11/13/2024. (Dougherty, Colin)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/31 10:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Luxury Pool Concepts, LLC. Luxury Pool Concepts, LLC served on 10/23/2024, answer due 11/13/2024. (Dougherty, Colin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/22 9:32 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Luxury Pool Concepts, LLC, James Weaver, filed by SCP Distributors LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 10/22 9:10 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (acw)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Non-Compliance of Local Rule 5.1(c) (Clerk's Notice) Tue 10/22 9:07 AM
Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket1 Complaint, filed by SCP Distributors LLC., and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket1 Complaint, filed by SCP Distributors LLC. as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 10/23/2024. (acw)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
2 2 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2) Mon 10/21 4:24 PM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff SCP Distributors LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 10/21 1:08 PM
COMPLAINT against Luxury Pool Concepts, LLC, James Weaver ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10216381), filed by SCP Distributors LLC. (Dougherty, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit B-UCC Financing Statement,
Att: 4 Summons Form to Weaver,
Att: 5 Summons Form to LPC