Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-40311

South Dakota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laura L Kulm Ask
Case #: 4:24-ap-04013
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2024
Terminated:Dec 26, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Nicholas Brandon Mackey
5807 W. Christopher Place, Apt. 313
Sioux Falls, SD 57106
Represented By
Nicholas Brandon Mackey
Unrepresented
contact info
Plaintiff
Lee Ann Pierce, Trustee
P.O. Box 524
Brookings, SD 57006
Represented By
Lee Ann Pierce
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Thursday, December 26, 2024
utility Close Adversary Case Thu 12/26 10:15 AM
Adversary Case 4:24-ap-4013 Closed. (jlill)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
15 15 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Internet Payment Mon 12/16 10:21 AM
Receipt of Request for Certified Copy([LINK 24-04013 ) [crditcrd,ccpd] ( 12.00) Filing Fee (doc. 14 ). Receipt Number A3892935, Filing Fee Amount $ 12.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
14 14 crditcrd Request for Certified Copy Mon 12/16 10:20 AM
Request for one Certified Copy(s) Related [+]. Fee due $12.00. (Pierce, Lee Ann)
Related: [-] 10 Default Judgment Order
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 12/11 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 12/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Default Judgment Order
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 12/11 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 12/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Application for Default Judgment
Monday, December 09, 2024
10 10 order Default Judgment Mon 12/09 4:04 PM
Default Judgment against Nicholas Brandon Mackey, submitted to BNC for service. (jlill)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Default Judgment Mon 12/09 4:01 PM
Order Directing Entry of Default Judgment against Nicholas Brandon Mackey Related [+], submitted to BNC for service. (jlill)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
7 7 motion Default Judgment Tue 11/26 8:53 AM
Application for Default Judgment filed by Lee Ann Pierce. (Pierce, Lee Ann)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Sunday, November 24, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 11/24 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 11/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Clerk's Entry of Default
Friday, November 22, 2024
5 5 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 11/22 8:52 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant(s) Nicholas Brandon Mackey Related [+], submitted to BNC for service. (jlill)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, October 21, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/21 2:33 PM
Summons Service Executed on Nicholas Brandon Mackey 10/21/2024. (Pierce, Lee Ann)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 10/21 12:31 PM
Summons issued on: Nicholas Brandon Mackey with answer due 11/20/2024. (eertz)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Statement of Fees - Deferred Mon 10/21 11:12 AM
Statement of Fees to Lee Ann Pierce Related [+]. (eertz)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/21 10:16 AM
Adversary case 24-04013 Complaint by Lee Ann Pierce against Nicholas Brandon Mackey. Fee due of 350.00 is deferred. (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (Pierce, Lee Ann)
Related: [-]