Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael S Nachmanoff
Referred: Lindsey R Vaala
Case #: 1:24-cv-01857
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2024
Terminated:Apr 14, 2025
Case in other court:Fairfax County Circuit Court, CL2024-12914
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 4:58 AM EDT
Defendant
United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By
Shannon Brown Schmoyer
Schmoyer Reinhard LLP
contact info
Karissa Thomas Kaseorg
Sands Anderson, PC
contact info
Laura Christine Emadi
Schmoyer Reinhard Llp (tx-Na)
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel L. Salvetti
14196 Hunters Run Way
Gainesville, VA 20155


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
62 62 appeal USCA Order Tue 05/06 12:22 PM
ORDER of USCA as to58 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel L. Salvetti. Upon consideration of appellees motion for abeyance, the court grants the motion and places this case in abeyance pending the issuance of a Final Rule regarding the Corporate Transparency Acts reporting requirements. The parties shall file a status report by June 5, 2025, and every 30 days afterward and shall immediately notify this court when the Final Rule is issued. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
61 61 appeal Appeal Remark Tue 04/29 12:13 PM
Letter from 4CCA requesting transmittal of record.(dvanm)
Related: [-]
60 60 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 04/29 12:12 PM
USCA Case Number 25-1465 4CCA, case manager Richard Sewell, for58 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel L. Salvetti. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
appeal Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA Tue 04/29 12:29 PM
Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re58 Notice of Appeal (dvanm, )
Related: [-]