Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Donald M Middlebrooks
Referred: William Matthewman
Case #: 9:24-cv-81323
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2024
Terminated:Dec 04, 2024
Case in other court:Fifteenth Judicial Circuit, 50204CA009184XXXAMB
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Aramark Campus, LLC
Represented By
Joseph Daniel Magrisso
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Aaron D Burks
2745 Ponce de Leon Blvd.
Coral Gables, FL 33134
Represented By
Peter Michael Hoogerwoerd
Remer & Georges-Pierre, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 12/04 4:12 PM
ORDER Closing Case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/4/2024. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Wed 11/27 8:23 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Aaron D Burks (Hoogerwoerd, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
7 7 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 11/22 5:26 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE CLOSING DOCUMENTS. The Parties have notified the Court that they have settled this matter (DE6 ), and the Court congratulates them on reaching an early and amicable resolution of this case. Because this case is newly filed and has resolved expeditiously, I will grant the Parties 20 days to file closing documents, as they request. Accordingly the Parties are directed to ensure that a stipulation of dismissal is filed no later than December 12, 2024. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/22/2024. (kid)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Thu 11/21 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Aaron D Burks (Hoogerwoerd, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
5 5 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 11/13 1:27 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 6/16/2025 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 6/11/2025 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman with notices (NEFs for Events only) for all filings in case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/12/2024. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
4 4 answer ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Mon 10/28 11:42 AM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Aramark Campus, LLC. (Magrisso, Joseph)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/28 11:39 AM
Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aramark Campus, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Aramark, Corporate Parent Aramark Educational Services, LLC, Corporate Parent Aramark Intermediate HoldCo Corporation, Corporate Parent Aramark Educational Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Aramark Services, Inc. for Aramark Campus, LLC (Magrisso, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 10/21 4:56 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar24)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Mon 10/21 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - BURKS, AARON V ARAMARK CAMPUS LLC) Filing fee $405.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-17922783, payment transferred from : 24cv81321 Burks v. Aramark Campus, LLC, filed by Aramark Campus, LLC.(Magrisso, Joseph) No Answer / Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 10/21/2024 (ar24)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Court File