Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:John R Adams
Case #: 5:24-cv-01827
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Kelly Prior
575 South Elm Avenue
Tallmadge, OH 44278
Represented By
J. Reid Yoder
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Law Office Of Benjamin R. Sorber
contact info
Defendant
Scott Prior
575 South Elm Avenue
Tallmadge, OH 44278
Represented By
J. Reid Yoder
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Law Office Of Benjamin R. Sorber
contact info
Defendant
Priority Advisors, LLC
3808 Mogadore Road
Mogadore, OH 44260
Represented By
J. Reid Yoder
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Law Office Of Benjamin R. Sorber
contact info
Plaintiff
Ohio Health Benefits, LLC
125 West Avenue Suite 101
Tallmadge, OH 44278
Represented By
Thomas E. Green
Kastner, Westman & Wilkins
contact info
Doston B. Jones
Kastner Westman & Wilkins - Akron
contact info
Paul J. Neel
Kastner Westman & Wilkins - Akron
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 20, 2025
15 15 notice Attorney Substitution (atty event) Thu 03/20 1:42 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Paul J. Neel and adding attorney Doston B. Jones filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Jones, Doston)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
14 14 resp Reply Thu 01/30 11:56 PM
Reply in support of9 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Sorber, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
13 13 resp Opposition Thu 01/16 11:46 AM
Opposition to9 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Ohio Health Benefits, LLC. (Neel, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
12 12 resp Reply Fri 12/27 3:31 PM
Reply in support of7 Motion for an Order that defendants respond to plaintiff's early Rule 34 requests filed by Ohio Health Benefits, LLC.(Neel, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Set of Request for Production of Documents for Scott Prior, Kelly Prior, Priority Advisors
Friday, December 20, 2024
11 11 resp Response Fri 12/20 3:28 PM
Response to7 Motion for an Order that defendants respond to plaintiff's early Rule 34 requests filed by All Defendants. (Sorber, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Fri 12/20 11:02 AM
Attorney Appearance by Benjamin R. Sorber filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Sorber, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 12/20 10:59 AM
Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Priority Advisors, LLC, Scott Prior, Kelly Prior. Related document(s)1 . (Yoder, J.)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Fri 12/20 10:55 AM
Attorney Appearance by J. Reid Yoder filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Yoder, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
7 7 motion Compel Discovery Fri 12/06 11:51 AM
Motion to compel discovery filed by Plaintiff Ohio Health Benefits, LLC.(Neel, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Email exchange between counsel regarding early discovery
Monday, November 25, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 11/25 8:40 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Priority Advisors, LLC waiver sent on 10/21/2024, answer due 12/20/2024 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Neel, Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 11/25 8:39 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Kelly Prior waiver sent on 10/21/2024, answer due 12/20/2024 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Neel, Paul)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 11/25 8:37 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Scott Prior waiver sent on 10/21/2024, answer due 12/20/2024 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Neel, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
3 3 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Mon 10/21 4:37 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. (No summons filed, no summons issued.) (E,CK)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Mon 10/21 3:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ohio Health Benefits, LLC. (Neel, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 10/21 3:27 PM
Complaint against Kelly Prior, Scott Prior, and Priority Advisors, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12792880. Filed by Ohio Health Benefits, LLC. (Neel, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Scott Prior Confidentiality and Non-Solicitation Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Kelly Prior Confidentiality and Non-Solicitation Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Scott Prior Non-Solicit Amendment (redacted),
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Kelly Prior Non-Solicit Amendment (redacted),
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 10/21 4:26 PM
Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (E,CK)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 10/21 4:35 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (E,CK)
Related: [-]