California Eastern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Thurston
Case #: 1:24-cv-01281
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2024
Terminated:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
CEP America LLC
Represented By
Lisa Yun Pruitt
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Shannon Z. Petersen
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Shannon Z Petersen
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wakefield & Associates, LLC
Represented By
James Kevin Schultz
Sessions Fishman Nathan & Israel, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Moreno
Represented By
Youssef Hussein Hammoud
The Credit Attorney, Inc.
contact info

GPO Dec 20 2024
ORDER GRANTING 14 Stipulation to Withdraw Defendant CEP America LLC's Motion to Dismiss and Extend its Deadline to Respond to the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/20/2024. Responses to complaint due by 1/31/2025. (Marrujo, C)
GPO Jan 10 2025
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. The Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for January 30, 2025 is CONTINUED to March 4, 2025, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties shall file a joint scheduling report on or before February 25, 2025. The parties shall appear at the conference remotely either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties will be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. All other deadlines, including the deadlines set by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) are continued based on the new Scheduling Conference date. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/10/2025. (Deputy Clerk YV)

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
29 29 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Order on Motion to Continue Fri 04/11 5:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): On April 11, 2025, the parties filed a stipulation that this action and all claims be dismissed with prejudice as to Defendants CEP America LLC and Wakefield & Associates, LLC. (Doc.28 .) In light of the stipulated dismissal, the Order to Show Cause issued on April 9, 2025 (Doc. 27 ) is HEREBY DISCHARGED, and the action is terminated by operation of law without further order from the Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). This Court VACATES all pending dates and matters, if any. The Clerk of the Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/11/2025. CASE CLOSED. (Deputy Clerk EV)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Continue Fri 04/11 1:47 PM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT CEP AMERICA LLC; and WAKEFIELD & ASSOCIATES, LLC by Maria Moreno. (Hammoud, Youssef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS CEP AMERICA LLC; and WAKEFIELD & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
27 27 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 04/09 2:51 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On February 3, 2025, following a notice of settlement, the Court ordered Plaintiff to file appropriate papers to dismiss or conclude this action no later than April 1, 2025. (Doc. 26 .) To date, no dispositional documents have been filed. Accordingly, within seven (7) days of the date of this order, Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failing to file appropriate documents to dismiss or conclude this action in its entirety. Plaintiff may comply with this order by filing either (1) a status report outlining the status of the settlement and explaining why the dispositional documents have not been filed, or (2) appropriate papers to dismiss or conclude this action in its entirety. Plaintiff is advised that failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause may result in dismissal of this action. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/9/2025. (Deputy Clerk EV)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
26 26 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Mon 02/03 11:01 AM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): On January 31, 2025, Plaintiff filed a notice of settlement of all claims. (Doc.25 .) Pursuant to Local Rule 160, and good cause appearing, this Court ORDERS Plaintiff, no later than April 1, 2025 , to file appropriate papers to dismiss or conclude this action in its entirety. This Court VACATES all pending dates and matters. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on counsel or parties who contributed to violation of this order. See Local Rule 160 and Local Rule 272. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/3/2025. (Deputy Clerk EV)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 01/31 5:22 PM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT AS TO DEFENDANTS CEP AMERICA LLC and WAKEFIELD & ASSOCIATES, LLC by Maria Moreno. Dispositional Docs due by 4/1/2025. (Hammoud, Youssef)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/31 5:14 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND CONTACT INFORMATION by Maria Moreno. (Hammoud, Youssef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 01/21 12:28 PM
ORDER GRANTING22 Joint Motion for Further Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/21/2025. (Deputy Clerk JPX)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 01/17 1:56 PM
MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to FILE ANSWER re1 Complaint Joint Motion for Further Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Wakefield & Associates, LLC.(Schultz, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 10, 2025
21 21 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion to Continue Fri 01/10 5:36 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. The Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for January 30, 2025 is CONTINUED to March 4, 2025, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe . The parties shall file a joint scheduling report on or before February 25, 2025. The parties shall appear at the conference remotely either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties will be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. All other deadlines, including the deadlines set by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) are continued based on the new Scheduling Conference date. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/10/2025. (Deputy Clerk YV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
20 20 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 01/08 11:48 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of the Initial Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines by CEP America LLC.(Yun Pruitt, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 02, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/02 2:17 PM
ORDER GRANTING Joint18 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/2/2025. (Deputy Clerk cm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/30 11:55 AM
MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to FILE ANSWER re1 Complaint by Wakefield & Associates, LLC. Attorney Schultz, James Kevin added. (Schultz, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 20, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 12/20 3:37 PM
ORDER GRANTING14 Stipulation to Withdraw Defendant CEP America LLC's Motion to Dismiss and Extend its Deadline to Respond to the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/20/2024. Responses to complaint due by 1/31/2025. (Marrujo, C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 12/19 2:12 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Withdraw CEP's Motion to Dismiss and Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint re14 Motion to Dismiss by CEP America LLC. (Yun Pruitt, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
15 15 order Minute Order Thu 12/19 1:51 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) Pursuant to Local Rule 302, the filed motion to dismiss14 will be heard and decided by the undersigned. As set forth in the Court's standing order, no hearing will be calendared, and the matter will be decided on the papers. As a result of the ongoing judicial resource emergency in this District, approximately 100 regular civil motions remain under submission before the undersigned. As a result, it is likely to be six or more months until the motion(s) in this matter is resolved. The Court reiterates that magistrate judge consent can alleviate the delay caused by the resource emergency. The parties SHALL reconsider magistrate judge consent for all purposes or only for this pending motion . In addition, the parties are reminded of their ongoing obligation to inform the Court of any changed circumstances that have rendered all or part of any pending motion moot. Finally, the parties are informed that the undersigned generally requires a formal settlement conference take place before any civil case proceeds to trial. Should the parties jointly wish to schedule a settlement conference, they are directed to contact Courtroom Deputy Irma Munoz at imunoz@caed.uscourts.gov signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on December 19, 2024. (Munoz, I)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
14 14 motion Dismiss Wed 12/18 2:20 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by CEP America LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Yun Pruitt, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
13 13 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 12/10 10:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due to the press of business, the Scheduling Conference is continued from 1/23/2025 to January 30, 2025, to 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe . The parties shall appear at the conference remotely by Zoom video conference. The parties will be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire is required. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/10/2024. (Valdez, E)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
12 12 order JLT Standing Order Thu 12/05 12:37 PM
STANDING ORDER signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on December 5, 2024.. (Munoz, I)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case Thu 12/05 9:45 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:24-cv-01281-JLT-BAM. (Xiong, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
10 10 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Wed 12/04 12:48 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Yun Pruitt, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
9 9 misc Stipulation Tue 11/19 11:37 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 28 DAYS FOR DEFENDANT WAKEFIELD AND ASSOCIATES by Maria Moreno. (Hammoud, Youssef)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/15 1:37 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant CEP America LLC. (Petersen, Shannon)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Stipulation Fri 11/15 12:31 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by not More Than 28 Days by CEP America LLC. Attorney Yun Pruitt, Lisa added. (Yun Pruitt, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/05 4:36 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Wakefield & Associates, LLC served on 10/29/2024, answer due 11/19/2024. (Hammoud, Youssef)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/05 4:32 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: CEP America LLC served on 11/1/2024, answer due 11/22/2024. (Hammoud, Youssef)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
4 4 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Mon 10/21 3:10 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Sant Agata, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A(m),
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
3 3 service Summons Mon 10/21 3:09 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *CEP America LLC, Wakefield & Associates, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Youssef H. Hammoud* *601 N. Parkcenter Drive* *Suite 202* *Santa Ana, CA 92705*. (Sant Agata, S)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Civil Cover Sheet Mon 10/21 2:50 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Maria Moreno (Hammoud, Youssef)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 10/21 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Maria Moreno. Attorney Hammoud, Youssef Hussein added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11822609) (Hammoud, Youssef)
Related: [-]