New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:24-bk-44354
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Dec 02, 2024

Debtor
Perelandra Natural Foods Center Inc.
175 Remsen St
Brooklyn, NY 11201-4333
Represented By
Paul A Rubin
Rubin LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Gregory Messer
Law Offices of Gregory Messer, PLLC 26 Court Street Suite 2400
Brooklyn, NY 11242
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 10/22/2024 12:05 AM EDT
Monday, October 21, 2024
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Mon 10/21 9:11 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:1 24-44354 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23046785. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 10/21 9:10 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals. Fee Amount $338 Filed by Paul A Rubin on behalf of Perelandra Natural Foods Center Inc. (Rubin, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) Mon 10/21 9:23 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202), Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals (Form 206Sum) for Non-Individuals , Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Filed by Paul A Rubin on behalf of Perelandra Natural Foods Center Inc. (Rubin, Paul)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207) Mon 10/21 9:25 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207) Filed by Paul A Rubin on behalf of Perelandra Natural Foods Center Inc. (Rubin, Paul)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Exhibit Mon 10/21 9:29 PM
Exhibit Corporate Resolution Filed by Paul A Rubin on behalf of Perelandra Natural Foods Center Inc. (Rubin, Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 10/21 9:34 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Paul A Rubin on behalf of Perelandra Natural Foods Center Inc. (Rubin, Paul)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1 Mon 10/21 9:34 PM
Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1 Filed by Paul A Rubin on behalf of Perelandra Natural Foods Center Inc. (Rubin, Paul)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Verification of List of Creditors Mon 10/21 9:40 PM
Verification of List of Creditors Filed by Paul A Rubin on behalf of Perelandra Natural Foods Center Inc. (Rubin, Paul)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 7 Business No Asset) (Auto Assign) Mon 10/21 10:02 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Business Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee, Messer, Gregory, with 341(a) Meeting to be held on 12/2/2024 at 11:30 AM at Zoom.us/join - Messer: Meeting ID 819 181 3629, Passcode 9491855830, Phone 1 (929)
Related: [-]