New York Southern District Court
Judge:Arun Subramanian
Case #: 1:24-cv-07547
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 5:49 AM EDT
ADR Provider
NICOLE MENDEZ
Defendant
NY Community Financial, LLC
Represented By
John L Shahdanian, II
Trenk Isabel Siddiqi & Shahdanian P.C.
contact info
Abed Z. Bhuyan
Wade Clark Mulcahy LLP
contact info
Defendant
CFSC
Plaintiff
Jason Wimberly
231 E. 117th Street Apt. 5D
New York, NY 10035


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
80 80 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 05/13 3:42 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:73 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, letter relying on 12/16/24 motion to dismiss and responding to amendments .,34 MOTION to Dismiss the complaint . . Document filed by NY Community Financial, LLC..(Bhuyan, Abed)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
misc Mailing Receipt Thu 05/08 11:20 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 75. Mailed to: Jason Wimberly 231 E. 117th Street Apt. 5D New York, NY 10035. (vba)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
75 75 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 05/06 10:46 AM
ORDER granting74 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The request is GRANTED. Plaintiff is directed to contact the Pro Se office to ensure that all filings are to form and appear on the docket. As the Court has previously advised the pa1iies, the Court will not accept or respond to non-emergency filings or motions made to the Chambers email. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at Dkt. 74. Replies due by 5/13/2025.. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 5/6/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]