New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:24-cv-08007
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Accutime Watch Corp.
Represented By
Christopher Curci
Ward Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Daman Singh
Represented By
Jillian Tattersall
Ballon Stoll
contact info
Marshall Benjamin Bellovin
Ballon Stoll P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Fri 05/02 1:48 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 6/24/2025 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
20 20 order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 04/10 10:00 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Stay Discovery: Granted. Discovery in this action is hereby stayed pending the Court's resolution of Defendant's motion to dismiss the complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (djh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
19 19 motion Stay Wed 04/09 1:29 PM
MOTION to Stay . Document filed by Accutime Watch Corp...(Curci, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - January 17, 2025 Order
Sunday, February 23, 2025
18 18 15 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Sun 02/23 10:01 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) . . Document filed by Daman Singh..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/12 12:53 PM
ORDER granting16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Granted. Plaintiff shall file any opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss on or before February 23, 2025. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (djh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/11 3:47 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) . addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Jillian Tattersall, Esq. dated February 11, 2025. Document filed by Daman Singh..(Tattersall, Jillian)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
15 15 motion Dismiss Fri 01/31 2:56 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) . Document filed by Accutime Watch Corp...(Curci, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Tue 01/28 11:44 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 2/27/2025.(sge)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
14 14 order Mediation Referral Order Fri 01/17 6:41 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court- annexed Mediation Program. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. SO ORDERED. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 1/31/2025. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/17/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Case Management Plan Fri 01/17 6:39 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). The parties shall be ready for trial on within two following the Final Pretrial Order. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is five days. The telephone conference previously scheduled for January 21, 2025, is ADJOURNED. The Court approves and so-orders the parties' proposed schedule. The parties shall file a joint status letter on or before the fact discovery deadline, currently May 21, 2025. SO ORDERED. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this Order. Depositions shall be completed by May 1, 2025. All expert discovery, including expert depositions, shall be completed no later than July 5, 2025. Deposition due by 7/5/2025. Fact Discovery due by 5/21/2025. Expert Discovery due by 7/5/2025. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/17/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
12 12 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Thu 01/16 2:09 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Accutime Watch Corp...(Curci, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 12/19 4:11 PM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before February 3, 2025. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (djh)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 12/19 1:19 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Jack S. Authorized Agent. Document filed by Daman Singh..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 12/18 3:43 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Christopher M. Curci, Esq. dated December 18, 2024. Document filed by Accutime Watch Corp...(Curci, Christopher)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 12/18 1:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Accutime Watch Corp. served on 12/13/2024, answer due 1/3/2025. Service was accepted by Jack S. -AuthorizedAgent. Document filed by Daman Singh..(Tattersall, Jillian)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/18 12:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jillian Tattersall on behalf of Daman Singh..(Tattersall, Jillian)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/16 1:34 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Curci on behalf of Accutime Watch Corp...(Curci, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 10/24 1:22 PM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/21/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Counsel should call (888) 557-8511 at the scheduled time. The access code is 9300838. Counsel who appear at the pretrial conference must be authorized to negotiate terms of settlement. Members of the public may join but are instructed to place their phones on mute. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/24/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 10/23 3:43 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Accutime Watch Corp...(jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 10/22 12:05 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Accutime Watch Corp., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Daman Singh..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 10/22 12:03 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Tue 10/22 10:24 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Marshall Benjamin Bellovin. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 10/22 10:26 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 10/22 10:26 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 10/22 10:26 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/21 8:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Accutime Watch Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30072796)Document filed by Daman Singh..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]