New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joanna Seybert
Case #: 2:24-cv-07320
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Eagle Remodeling GC Inc
Represented By
Chaya M Gourarie
Bell Law Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Eagle Remodeling, Inc
Represented By
Chaya M Gourarie
Bell Law Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Eagle Roofing Contractor Inc.
Represented By
Chaya M Gourarie
Bell Law Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Luis E. Lobos
Defendant
Marco Ignacio Lobos Lopez
Represented By
Chaya M Gourarie
Bell Law Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Rosa Maria Orantes Quintanilla
Represented By
Chaya M Gourarie
Bell Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Aquiles Flores Duran
Represented By
Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Naydenskiy Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Colin J Mulholland
Law Offices Of Colin Mulholland
contact info
Plaintiff
Dionicio Flores Duran
Represented By
Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Naydenskiy Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Colin J Mulholland
Law Offices Of Colin Mulholland
contact info
Plaintiff
Geuser Gualberto Manzor Bhor
Represented By
Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Naydenskiy Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Colin J Mulholland
Law Offices Of Colin Mulholland
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
22 22 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/01 12:16 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference will be held at 12:00 p.m. on June 20, 2025 before the undersigned by phone. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 571-353-2301 with ID# 179933855. The attached Discovery Plan Worksheet is to be completed by counsel and electronically filed with the Court by June 18th. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 5/1/2025. (LV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/29 12:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Eagle Remodeling GC Inc, Eagle Remodeling, Inc, Eagle Roofing Contractor Inc., Marco Ignacio Lobos Lopez, Rosa Maria Orantes Quintanilla. (Gourarie, Chaya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion to Set Aside Default Wed 03/19 1:42 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Eagle Remodeling GC Inc answer due 4/29/2025; Eagle Remodeling, Inc answer due 4/29/2025; Eagle Roofing Contractor Inc. answer due 4/29/2025; Marco Ignacio Lobos Lopez answer due 4/29/2025; Rosa Maria Orantes Quintanilla answer due 4/29/2025.; granting20 Motion to Set Aside Default. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 3/19/2025. (LV)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Set Aside Default Fri 02/28 4:53 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Consent MOTION to Set Aside Default dated February 7, 2025 by Eagle Remodeling GC Inc, Eagle Remodeling, Inc, Eagle Roofing Contractor Inc., Marco Ignacio Lobos Lopez, Rosa Maria Orantes Quintanilla. (Gourarie, Chaya)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/28 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chaya M Gourarie on behalf of Eagle Remodeling GC Inc, Eagle Remodeling, Inc, Eagle Roofing Contractor Inc., Marco Ignacio Lobos Lopez, Rosa Maria Orantes Quintanilla (aty to be noticed) (Gourarie, Chaya)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/27 4:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dionicio Flores Duran, Aquiles Flores Duran, Geuser Gualberto Manzor Bhor. Luis E. Lobos served on 2/24/2025, answer due 3/17/2025. (Mulholland, Colin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 02/11 4:21 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The time for Plaintiff to effect service on defendant Luis Lobos is extended to March 14, 2025. Plaintiff shall file a motion for default against all remaining defendants who defaulted, in accordance with the District Judge's Motion Practice Rules. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 2/11/2025. (LV)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 02/07 6:36 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Luis Lobos and Status Report by Geuser Gualberto Manzor Bhor, Aquiles Flores Duran, Dionicio Flores Duran. (Mulholland, Colin)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 02/07 10:24 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendants Rosa Maria Orantes Quintanilla, Eagle Roofing Contractor Inc., Eagle Remodeling GC Inc, Eagle Remodeling, Inc, and Marco Ignacio Lobos Lopez have failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the defaults of defendants Rosa Maria Orantes Quintanilla, Eagle Roofing Contractor Inc., Eagle Remodeling GC Inc, Eagle Remodeling, Inc, and Marco Ignacio Lobos Lopez are hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
15 15 misc Request for Certificate of Default Thu 02/06 5:44 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Geuser Gualberto Manzor Bhor, Aquiles Flores Duran, Dionicio Flores Duran (Mulholland, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support,
Att: 2 Supplement,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Proposed Order,
Att: 6 Proposed Order,
Att: 7 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
order Status Report Order Tue 02/04 8:04 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. Counsel for Plaintiff shall electronically file a status report by 2/7/2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 2/4/2025. (LV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
misc Request for Certificate of Default - Denied Tue 01/07 3:24 PM
REQUEST for Certificate of Default14 is denied at this time. Under Local Civil Rule 55.1(a)(4), the party seeking entry of default must file "a certificate of service showing that the foregoing documents have been personally served on, or mailed to the last known residence (for an individual defendant) or business address (for other defendants) of, the party against whom default is sought." Plaintiff may refile a properly documented request. (JT)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
14 14 misc Request for Certificate of Default Fri 01/03 5:25 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Aquiles Flores Duran, Dionicio Flores Duran (Mulholland, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Proposed Order,
Att: 6 Proposed Order
Friday, December 20, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Document Leave to File Document Fri 12/20 12:13 PM
First MOTION for Extension of time to Request Certificate of Default , by Geuser Gualberto Manzor Bhor, Aquiles Flores Duran, Dionicio Flores Duran. (Mulholland, Colin) Modified on 12/20/2024 (LV)
Related: [-]
order Order to Show Cause Fri 12/20 11:51 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Counsel for Plaintiff has failed to comply with this Court's Orders of November 22, 2024 and December 5, 2024. Accordingly, by December 27, 2024, counsel shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/20/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - Declined Fri 12/20 2:47 PM
NOTICE to Assign District Judge: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. (LV)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Fri 12/20 3:01 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CG)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 12/20 3:28 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to File; terminating13 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff shall request certificates of default by January 3, 2025. Counsel shall move for default in accordance with the District Courts motion practices. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/20/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
order Order(Other) Thu 12/05 8:22 AM
ORDER. Plaintiffs' counsel shall immediately file the status report which was due 11/29/24. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/5/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/04 2:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dionicio Flores Duran, Aquiles Flores Duran, Geuser Gualberto Manzor Bhor. Eagle Remodeling, Inc served on 11/5/2024, answer due 11/26/2024. (Naydenskiy, Gennadiy)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/04 2:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dionicio Flores Duran, Aquiles Flores Duran, Geuser Gualberto Manzor Bhor. Eagle Remodeling GC Inc served on 11/5/2024, answer due 11/26/2024. (Naydenskiy, Gennadiy)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/04 2:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dionicio Flores Duran, Aquiles Flores Duran, Geuser Gualberto Manzor Bhor. Eagle Roofing Contractor Inc. served on 11/5/2024, answer due 11/26/2024. (Naydenskiy, Gennadiy)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
order Status Report Order Fri 11/22 8:58 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to electronically file a status report with the Court by 11/29/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 11/22/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/08 11:56 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dionicio Flores Duran, Aquiles Flores Duran, Geuser Gualberto Manzor Bhor. Rosa Maria Orantes Quintanilla served on 10/30/2024, answer due 11/20/2024. (Naydenskiy, Gennadiy)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/08 11:50 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dionicio Flores Duran, Aquiles Flores Duran, Geuser Gualberto Manzor Bhor. Marco Ignacio Lobos Lopez served on 10/30/2024, answer due 11/20/2024. (Naydenskiy, Gennadiy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 10/22 3:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Luis E. Lobos, Marco Ignacio Lobos Lopez, Rosa Maria Orantes Quintanilla. (IL)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 10/22 3:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Eagle Remodeling GC Inc, Eagle Remodeling, Inc, Eagle Roofing Contractor Inc.. (IL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 10/21 6:47 PM
Proposed Summons. by Geuser Gualberto Manzor Bhor, Aquiles Flores Duran, Dionicio Flores Duran (Naydenskiy, Gennadiy)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 10/21 6:46 PM
Proposed Summons. by Geuser Gualberto Manzor Bhor, Aquiles Flores Duran, Dionicio Flores Duran (Naydenskiy, Gennadiy)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Mon 10/21 10:06 AM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (LJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 10/21 10:03 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/21 10:05 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Mon 10/21 10:08 AM
Your proposed summonses were not issued for the following reason: No name and address was provided in the Plaintiffs attorney name and addresses section. Please correct and resubmit using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (LJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
1 1 15 pgs COMPLAINT against Eagle Remodeling GC Inc, Eagle Remodeling, Inc, Eagle Roofing Contractor Inc, Luis E. Lobos, Marco Ignacio Lobos Lopez, Rosa Maria Orantes Quintanilla filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18402615 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Dionicio Flores Duran, Aquiles Flores Duran, Geuser Gualberto Manzor Bhor. (Naydenskiy, Gennadiy) Modified on 10/21/2024 (LJ).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons