Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Sara Darrow
Referred: Ronald L Hanna
Case #: 3:24-cv-03299
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 3:36 AM CDT
Defendant
Kevin Huber
Represented By
Margaret Jones
Illinois Attorney General
contact info
Mary Alice Johnston
Illinois Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Jay Robert Pritzker
Represented By
Margaret Jones
Illinois Attorney General
contact info
Mary Alice Johnston
Illinois Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
American Alliance for Equal Rights
Represented By
Erin Elizabeth Wilcox
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Samantha Romero
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info


Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 05/08 4:26 PM
TEXT ORDER granting15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mary Alice Johnston terminated as counsel of record for Defendants. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ronald L Hanna on 05/08/2025. (NJR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
15 15 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 05/07 11:15 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mary Johnston by Defendants Kevin Huber, Jay Robert Pritzker. (Johnston, Mary)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
order Order Assigning Referral Judge Fri 04/25 11:30 AM
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
14 14 14 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion/Petition Fri 01/17 10:35 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff American Alliance for Equal Rights. (Wilcox, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines (including Answer ddl) Thu 12/26 9:52 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Pursuant to 12/23/2024 Text Order, Plaintiff to respond to Defendants'11 Motion to Dismiss by 1/17/2025. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/23 11:19 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plaintiff American Alliance for Equal Rights. Responses due by 1/6/2025 (Wilcox, Erin)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/23 4:06 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on December 23, 2024. Plaintiff's13 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants'11 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint is now January 17, 2025. (KJC)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
12 12 12 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion/Petition Fri 12/20 2:56 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Jay Robert Pritzker, Kevin Huber. (Johnston, Mary)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 12/20 2:56 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Jay Robert Pritzker, Kevin Huber. Responses due by 1/3/2025 (Johnston, Mary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 12/11 11:31 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by Defendants Jay Robert Pritzker, Kevin Huber. (Johnston, Mary)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 12/11 2:54 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on December 11, 2024. The Court GRANTS Defendants'10 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants' responsive pleading deadline is now December 20, 2024. (ARR)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 17, 2024
order Order Removing JEH as MJ Re DJ Hawley Apt Sun 11/17 3:21 PM
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 11/14 9:24 AM
TEXT ORDER granting9 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Kevin Huber and Jay Robert Pritzker's responsive pleading deadline is extended to 12/13/2024. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 11/14/24. (WG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 11/13 9:38 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Defendants Jay Robert Pritzker, Kevin Huber. (Johnston, Mary)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer) Fri 11/01 4:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Alliance for Equal Rights. Kevin Huber served on 10/29/2024, answer due 11/19/2024; Jay Robert Pritzker served on 10/25/2024, answer due 11/15/2024.(Wilcox, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service to Kevin Huber
Thursday, October 31, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Thu 10/31 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mary Alice Johnston on behalf of Kevin Huber (Johnston, Mary)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Thu 10/31 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Margaret Jones on behalf of Jay Robert Pritzker, Kevin Huber (Jones, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Tue 10/29 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mary Alice Johnston on behalf of Jay Robert Pritzker (Johnston, Mary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Wed 10/23 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Samantha Romero on behalf of American Alliance for Equal Rights (Romero, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 10/22 3:34 PM
Original Summonses mailed to Plaintiff counsel for service. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Huber Summons
2 2 misc 7.1 Disclosure Statement Tue 10/22 10:30 AM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by American Alliance for Equal Rights. (Wilcox, Erin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Attorney Complaint Tue 10/22 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Kevin Huber, Jay Robert Pritzker ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILCDC-4588922.), filed by American Alliance for Equal Rights.(Wilcox, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons to Jay Robert Pritzker,
Att: 3 Summons to Kevin Huber