Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-11254

Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 2:24-ap-01047
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Air Ambulance Worldwide, LLC
Represented By
Air Ambulance Worldwide, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dwayne M. Murray
Represented By
Christopher T. Caplinger
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Friday, April 04, 2025
13 13 order Dismissing Case (Order) Fri 04/04 12:19 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case with Prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 4/4/25. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
12 12 motion Dismiss Case Fri 04/04 9:38 AM
Consent Motion to Dismiss Case with Prejudice Filed by Katherine Elizabeth Clark of Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard on behalf of Dwayne M. Murray (Clark, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Draft Order
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing (AP) Wed 02/26 2:33 PM
Notice of Hearing by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501 Filed by Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)9 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray) Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2025 at 03:30 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Caplinger, Christopher
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 02/25 2:37 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Samuel Riccardi on behalf of Dwayne M. Murray. (Riccardi, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
9 9 motion Default Judgment (Motion) (AP) Fri 02/21 11:29 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Motion for Default Judgment Against Air Ambulance Worldwide, LLC Filed by Dwayne M. Murray (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
8 8 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 02/18 4:38 PM
Clerk's Entry of Defaul Related [+]. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 7 Request for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
Friday, February 14, 2025
7 7 miscap Request for Entry of Default (PF) Fri 02/14 1:18 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Air Ambulance Worldwide, LLC Filed by Dwayne M. Murray (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/13 4:06 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Dwayne M. Murray on behalf of Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray. (Murray, Dwayne)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Fri 11/08 2:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)4 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Thursday, October 24, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 10/24 4:55 PM
Order Regarding Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order. Docket Call for this trial will be held on April 23, 2025 at 2:00 pm at 3rd Floor, Courtroom 5, 800 Lafayette St, Lafayette, LA 70501. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 10/24/24 Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/22 2:51 PM
Summons Service Executed on Air Ambulance Worldwide, LLC 10/22/2024 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (AP) Tue 10/22 9:49 AM
Summons Issued on Air Ambulance Worldwide, LLC Answer Due 11/21/2024. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/21 4:18 PM
Adversary case 24-01047 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Fraudulent Transfer by Dwayne M. Murray against Air Ambulance Worldwide, LLC. Fee Amount $350. (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Civil Sheet