Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-11254

Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 2:24-ap-01048
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Gulf South Healthcare Management, LLC
Represented By
Gulf South Healthcare Management, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dwayne M. Murray
Represented By
Christopher T. Caplinger
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, March 10, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 03/10 3:41 PM
Order Granting Motion to Continue Adversary Proceedings Trial Docket Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 3/10/25 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 8/20/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 3 Order,10 Motion to Continue Trial filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
Friday, March 07, 2025
10 10 motion Continue Trial (Motion) (AP) Fri 03/07 10:55 AM
Motion to Continue Trial on Litigation Trustee's Unopposed Motion to Reset Trial Docket Call Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)3 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Thursday, January 02, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint (AP) Thu 01/02 8:29 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Gulf South Healthcare Management, LLC (DeTrinis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
8 8 order Extend Time (Order) Thu 12/05 2:28 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 12/5/24. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Extend Time filed by Defendant Gulf South Healthcare Management, LLC
utility Reset Answer Deadline (AP) Thu 12/05 2:28 PM
Gulf South Healthcare Management, LLC Answer Deadline Reset for 12/20/2024. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
7 7 motion 03Extend Time Wed 11/20 5:09 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to file responsive pleading Filed by Adam M Stumpf of Chehardy, Sherman, Ellis, Murray, Recile on behalf of Gulf South Healthcare Management, LLC (Stumpf, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/13 4:08 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Dwayne M. Murray on behalf of Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray. (Murray, Dwayne)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Fri 11/08 2:40 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)3 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/05 1:41 PM
Summons Service Executed on Gulf South Healthcare Management, LLC 10/22/2024 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
3 3 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 10/24 4:56 PM
Order Regarding Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order. Docket Call for this trial will be held on April 23, 2025 at 2:00 pm at 3rd Floor, Courtroom 5, 800 Lafayette St, Lafayette, LA 70501. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 10/24/24 Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (AP) Tue 10/22 9:51 AM
Summons Issued on Gulf South Healthcare Management, LLC Answer Due 11/21/2024. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/21 4:22 PM
Adversary case 24-01048 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Fraudulent Transfers by Dwayne M. Murray against Gulf South Healthcare Management, LLC. Fee Amount $350. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Civil Sheet