California Central District Court
Judge:Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Referred: Sheri Pym
Case #: 5:24-cv-02250
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2024
Terminated:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 1:46 AM PDT
Defendant
Robert Darish
Defendant
La Cumbre Maya Express
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Mario Mendoza
Represented By
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
11 11 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 10/30 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Mario Mendoza. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 10/28 4:58 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/28 3:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than November 8, 2024. The Court sets a hearing date regarding this Order to Show Cause on November 15, 2024, at 1:00 PM via zoom. (see document for further information) (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 10/24 2:48 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 10/24 2:45 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Robert Darish, La Cumbre Maya Express. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 10/24 2:43 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 10/24 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 10/22 11:46 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Mario Mendoza. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 10/22 11:45 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 10/22 11:45 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mario Mendoza. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/22 11:44 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38441121 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Mario Mendoza(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]