Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Carlton W Reeves
Referred: Andrew S Harris
Case #: 3:24-cv-00663
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 4:10 AM CDT
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1-10
Defendant
Warden Gary Edwards
Defendant
Sheriff Jeremy McCoy, Sr.
Represented By
Roy Jefferson Allen
Hunt, Ross & Allen, PA
contact info
Defendant
Mississippi Department of Corrections
Represented By
Elizabeth Claire Barker-State Gov
Mississippi Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Oak Haven Apartments
Represented By
Hiawatha Northington, II
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, Llp - Ridgeland
contact info
Defendant
Leroy Thompson
Defendant
Yazoo County Regional Correctional Facility
Defendant
Yazoo County, Mississippi
Represented By
Roy Jefferson Allen
Hunt, Ross & Allen, PA
contact info
Defendant
Mississippi Sherriff's Department
Plaintiff
Mary Brown
Represented By
Ava Burton Waller
Waller & Waller
contact info
Robert O. Waller
Waller & Waller
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Baptist Hospital - Yazoo
Terminated: 01/07/2025
Represented By
Charles Walter Kihm
Wise, Carter, Child & Caraway, Pa - Jackson
contact info
Dudley Collier Graham, Jr.
Wise, Carter, Child & Caraway, Pa - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Pafford EMS of MS
Terminated: 04/17/2025
Represented By
Mackenzie Nicole Ellis
Chartwell Law
contact info
Michael Garner Berry
Chartwell Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
52 52 discov Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production Tue 05/13 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Mary Brown (Waller, Robert)
Related: [-]
51 51 discov Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories Tue 05/13 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Mary Brown (Waller, Robert)
Related: [-]