Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Cecilia M Altonaga
Referred: Lisette M Reid
Case #: 1:24-cv-24084
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2024
Terminated:Feb 10, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 7:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By
John Goldmark
Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP
contact info
Brian W. Toth
Toth Funes PA
contact info
Lauren Rainwater
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Freddy Funes
Toth Funes PA
contact info
Mediator
Pamela I. Perry
Plaintiff
Ecom Authority LLC
283 Catalonia Avenue, Suite 200
Coral Gables, FL 33134
Represented By
David Robbins
Pbya
contact info
Paul Dewey Turner
Perlman, Bajandas, Yevoli & Albright, P.L.
contact info
Benjamin Lawrence Reiss
Perlman, Bajandas, Yevoli & Albright
contact info
Ricardo Andres Arce
Perlman, Bajandas, Yevoli &albright, P.L.
contact info

GPO Jan 07 2025
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Count 3 of the Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (ps1)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
54 54 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 05/07 4:58 PM
ORDER granting53 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal by July 7, 2025. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
53 53 motion Extension of Time Wed 05/07 3:18 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal re52 Administrative Order, by Amazon.com Services LLC. Responses due by 5/21/2025.(Toth, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order