California Central District Court
Judge:John A Kronstadt
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:24-cv-09101
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2024
Re-opened:Jan 15, 2025
Terminated:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 1:50 AM PDT
Defendant
Cornerstone by Work, LLC
Plaintiff
Angela Anderson
Represented By
Christopher E. Roberts
Butsch Roberts And Associates LLC
contact info
Kolin Tang
Miller Shah LLP
contact info
James C. Shah
Miller Shah LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
S.USA Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Terminated: 03/24/2025
Represented By
Cody A DeCamp
Manatt Phelps And Phillips, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
27 27 service Summons Issued Wed 03/26 3:49 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued on Amended Complaint24 as to Defendant Cornerstone by Work, LLC. (yl)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
26 26 notice Summons Request Mon 03/24 3:26 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition24 filed by Plaintiff Angela Anderson. (Shah, James)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Mon 03/24 1:45 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Angela Anderson pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to S.USA Life Insurance Company, Inc.. (Shah, James)
Related: [-]
24 24 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Mon 03/24 1:31 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Cornerstone by Work, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Angela Anderson(Shah, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
23 23 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 03/10 10:29 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) TEXT-ONLY ORDER RE STATUS REPORT (DKT.22 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Based on a review of Plaintiff's Status Report (Dkt.22 ) filed on February 24, 2025, the following determinations have been made. The Order to Show Cause presently scheduled for March 17, 2025, is DISCHARGED. No appearance by counsel is required. A proposed order dismissing S. USA Life Insurance Co., as well as an amended complaint in which a new defendant is named, shall be filed on or before March 24, 2025. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mhk)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
22 22 misc Status Report Mon 02/24 2:44 PM
STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Angela Anderson. (Tang, Kolin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 01/16 8:34 AM
ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF RESOLUTION AND REQUEST TO STAY (DKT.17 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Accordingly, the Request is GRANTED, as follows. It is determined that all upcoming deadlines in this matter are VACATED. An Order to Show Cause re Dismissal is set for March 17, 2025 at 10:30 a.m., with the final time to be set when the final calendar issues for that date. On or before March 10, 2025, the parties shall file either a request for dismissal, or a joint report in response to the OSC, which shall include the procedural status of finalizing the settlement and the anticipated date by which the parties will request the dismissal of this action. This Order supersedes the one previously issued (Dkt. 18) dismissing this action. That Order is VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
21 21 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Case Reopened Thu 01/16 3:11 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) MINUTE ORDER REOPENING by Judge John A. Kronstadt. This case was previously closed in error. (Case reopened. MD JS-5.) (yl)
Related: [-]
19 19 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 01/15 4:18 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Daniel Torrez, Courtroom Deputy Clerk to Judge John A. Kronstadt: You are hereby notified that due to a clerical error the Order Striking Order Dismissing Case Without Prejudice (Dkt.18 ) is STRICKEN. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dto)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 01/15 3:59 PM
[STRICKEN AS OF IN 01/15/2025 19 ] (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Dkt.17 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. In light of the Notice of Resolution (Dkt. 17), the Court orders that the action is dismissed without prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction to vacate this Order and to reopen the action within 30 days from the date of this Order; provided, however, any request by any party(ies) that the Court do so, shall make a showing of good cause as to why the settlement has not been completed within the 30-day period, what further settlement processes are necessary, and when the party(ies) making such a request reasonably expect the process to be concluded. (See document for further details) (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/08 12:25 PM
Notice of Resolution and Request to Stay filed by Plaintiff Angela Anderson. (Tang, Kolin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order Extending Answer Due Deadline Mon 12/16 3:21 PM
ORDER REGARDING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (DKT. [5)] by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Based on a review of the Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint sufficient good cause has been shown for the requested relief. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the initial Complaint is extended to January 17, 2025. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
15 15 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Thu 12/12 9:23 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 1/17/2025 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant S.USA Life Insurance Company, Inc..(DeCamp, Cody)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
14 14 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 11/12 12:52 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to S.USA Life Insurance Company, Inc. answer now due 12/18/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant S.USA Life Insurance Company, Inc..(Attorney Cody A DeCamp added to party S.USA Life Insurance Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(DeCamp, Cody)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
13 13 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 10/31 3:46 PM
STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (dto)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
12 12 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/29 3:48 PM
ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting10 Non-Resident Attorney Christopher E. Roberts APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Anderson, designating James Shah as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 10/29 2:42 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Angela Anderson, upon Defendant S.USA Life Insurance Company, Inc. served on 10/28/2024, answer due 11/18/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, Intake Specialist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Shah, James)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 10/29 2:18 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher E. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Anderson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38487363) filed by Plaintiff Angela Anderson. (Shah, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, October 28, 2024
9 9 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Mon 10/28 8:59 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christopher E. Roberts. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 10/25 12:47 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant S.USA Life Insurance Company, Inc. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 10/25 12:29 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 10/25 12:29 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 10/25 12:28 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 10/22 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Angela Anderson, (Shah, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Tue 10/22 3:55 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Angela Anderson. (Shah, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 10/22 3:53 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Angela Anderson. (Shah, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/22 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38444639 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Angela Anderson. (Attorney James C. Shah added to party Angela Anderson(pty:pla))(Shah, James)
Related: [-]