Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Aida M Delgado-Colon
Case #: 3:24-mc-00445
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2024
Petitioner
Catalent Pharma Solutions, Inc.
Petitioner
Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC
Petitioner
Catalent, Inc.
Respondent
Romark Global Pharma, LLC

GPO Feb 13 2025
OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons stated, the Court GRANTS Catalent's amended motion to confirm the Final Arbitration Award at ECF No. 22. Romark's motion to vacate at ECF No. 9 is DENIED. Judgment shall be entered in favor of Catalent in the amount of $4,512,482.63 plus interest from August 17, 2024, to the final date of payment on such Judgment, to be calculated at a per-day rate of.058% for months ending in 30 days and.056% for months ending in 31 days. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/12/2025.(wm)

Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
41 41 motion Execution of Judgment Thu 04/03 5:33 PM
MOTION for Execution of Judgment filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 4/21/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order of Execution,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Writ of Execution of Judgment
Friday, February 28, 2025
40 40 order Judgment Fri 02/28 2:45 PM
JUDGMENT is hereby entered in favor of Catalent in the amount of $4,512,482.63 plus interest from August 17, 2024, to the final date of payment on this Judgment, to be calculated at a perday rate of.058% for months ending in 30 days and.056% for months ending in 31 days. Signed by Clerk on 2/28/2025.(vso)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
39 39 order Order on Motion for Judgment Thu 02/13 3:53 PM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Judgment. See Opinion and Order at ECF No. 38. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/12/2025. (wm)
Related: [-]
38 38 order Order on Motion requesting Order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 02/13 3:47 PM
ORDER. The Motions to Withdraw Attorney at ECF Nos. 26, 33 are GRANTED. Attorney Ivan Llado-Rodriguez is granted leave to withdraw from Romark Global Pharma LLC's legal representation. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/12/2025. (wm) Modified typographical error on 2/13/2025 (idg)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Order on Motion In Compliance Thu 02/13 3:43 PM
ORDER. The Motion In Compliance at ECF No. 31 is NOTED. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/12/2025. (wm)
Related: [-]
36 36 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 02/13 3:39 PM
ORDER. The motions to restrict at ECF Nos. 2, 10 are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/12/2025.(wm)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Order on Motion requesting Order Thu 02/13 3:34 PM
ORDER. The Motion requesting Order at ECF No. 1 is MOOT in light of ECF No. 22. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/12/2025. (wm)
Related: [-]
34 34 7 pgs order Opinion and Order Thu 02/13 3:29 PM
OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons stated, the Court GRANTS Catalent's amended motion to confirm the Final Arbitration Award at ECF No. 22. Romark's motion to vacate at ECF No. 9 is DENIED. Judgment shall be entered in favor of Catalent in the amount of $4,512,482.63 plus interest from August 17, 2024, to the final date of payment on such Judgment, to be calculated at a per-day rate of.058% for months ending in 30 days and.056% for months ending in 31 days. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/12/2025.(wm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
33 33 motion Requesting Order Tue 02/11 12:35 PM
MOTION requesting Order on withdrawal as counsel (Dkt. 26) filed by Ivan Llado-Rodriguez on behalf of Romark Global Pharma, LLC. Responses due by 2/25/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
32 32 motion Judgment Mon 02/10 1:02 PM
MOTION for Judgment of Confirmation and Regarding Romark Noncompliance filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 2/24/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
31 31 motion In Compliance Mon 01/27 9:49 AM
Motion In Compliance as to 30 Order on Motion In Compliance, filed by Ivan Llado-Rodriguez on behalf of Romark Global Pharma, LLC. Responses due by 2/10/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan)
Related: [-] 30
Friday, January 24, 2025
30 30 order Order on Motion In Compliance Fri 01/24 12:06 PM
ORDER. The Motion In Compliance at ECF No. 29 is NOTED. The Court hereby clarifies its Order at ECF No. 28 to specify that respondent is to comply with paragraph "3" (not "2") of its Order at ECF No. 14. Attorney for respondent Ivan J. Llado shall likewise transmit this Order to respondent and certify as much to the Court. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 1/24/2024. (wm)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion In Compliance Fri 01/24 10:53 AM
Motion In Compliance as to 28 Order,, filed by Ivan Llado-Rodriguez on behalf of Romark Global Pharma, LLC. Responses due by 2/7/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan)
Related: [-] 28
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
28 28 order Order Tue 01/21 3:35 PM
ORDER. The Motion at ECF No.26 is HELD IN ABEYANCE. Respondent Romark Global Pharma, LLC shall have until 02/05/2025 to both retain counsel and comply with paragraph 2 of the Court's Order at ECF No. 14. No extensions will be granted. Failure to comply will result in confirmation of the arbitration award. Attorney for respondent Ivan J. Llado is to transmit this Order to respondent and certify as much to the Court. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 1/21/2025.(wm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
27 27 respm Response to Motion Thu 01/16 11:09 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC Re:26 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Ivan Llado-Rodriguez MOTION for extension of time until March 2, 2025 to secure new legal representation and comply with briefing schedule at Docket No. 24 filed by Romark Global Pharma, LLC filed by Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Withdraw as Attorney Extension of Time Thu 01/16 5:23 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Ivan Llado-Rodriguez, MOTION for extension of time until March 2, 2025 to secure new legal representation and comply with briefing schedule at Docket No. 24 filed by Ivan Llado-Rodriguez on behalf of Romark Global Pharma, LLC. Responses due by 1/30/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 12/19 4:52 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion for extension of time. The parties shall adhere to the modified briefing schedule agreed to in ECF No. 24. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/19/2024. (wm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
24 24 motion Extension of Time Wed 12/18 5:37 PM
Consent MOTION for extension of time to comply with Order on Briefing Schedule at Dkt.14 filed by Ivan Llado-Rodriguez on behalf of Romark Global Pharma, LLC. Responses due by 1/2/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
23 23 misc Notice to Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/05 6:31 PM
NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Lara Kasten Hoffman, Jack W. Pirozzolo, David C. Rose re: 18 Order on Motion to Appear PHV, 19 Order on Motion to Appear PHV, 17 Order on Motion to Appear PHV: The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link:[LINK:https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you] . (idg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
22 22 motion In Compliance Wed 12/04 6:51 PM
Motion In Compliance submitting Amended Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Award as to11 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 12/18/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
Related: [-] 11
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 12/04 6:23 PM
ORDER. The Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply at ECF No. 13 is MOOT in light of ECF No. 14. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/04/2024. (wm)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Motion for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/04 6:22 PM
ORDER finding as moot7 Motion for Issuance of Summons. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/04/2024. (wm)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order on Motion to Appear PHV Wed 12/04 6:20 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/04/2024. (wm)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Motion to Appear PHV Wed 12/04 6:19 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/04/2024. (wm)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion to Appear PHV Wed 12/04 6:17 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/04/2024. (wm)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order Wed 12/04 6:12 PM
ORDER re15 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Respondent's corporate disclosure statement at ECF No. 15 fails to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2). Respondent shall resubmit a compliant statement by the deadline provided in the Court's Order at ECF No. 14. The Court strongly encourages respondent to re-read and digest its November 20, 2024 Order at ECF No. 11. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/04/2024.(wm)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement - Attorney Only Wed 12/04 4:58 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement byRomark Global Pharma, LLC. (Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order Wed 12/04 11:46 AM
ORDER. Anticipating unnecessary complications in motion practice, and with the aim of simplifying the proceedings before the Court, the Court ORDERS as per attached briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/04/2024.(wm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 11/27 5:19 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until December 12, 2024 to File Response/Reply as to9 MOTION requesting Order Vacating Arbitration Award filed by Romark Global Pharma, LLC filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 12/11/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement - Attorney Only Wed 11/20 5:58 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement byCatalent Pharma Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Catalent Pharma Solutions, Inc. for Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC.. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
Related: [-]
11 11 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/20 4:40 PM
ORDER. The Petitioner is hereby ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and amend the petition to include a proper jurisdictional statement. Petitioner is granted 14 days from the date of this Order to comply. Due by 12/4/2024. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/20/2024. (glr) Modified due date on 11/20/2024 (idg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
10 10 motion Restrict Fri 11/15 2:41 PM
MOTION to Restrict Document at Docket [9-2] filed by Ivan Llado-Rodriguez on behalf of Romark Global Pharma, LLC. Responses due by 11/29/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
9 9 motion Requesting Order Thu 11/14 7:42 PM
MOTION requesting Order Vacating Arbitration Award filed by Ivan Llado-Rodriguez on behalf of Romark Global Pharma, LLC. Responses due by 11/29/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit CSA,
Att: 3 Exhibit Award
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/14 1:29 PM
Motion to allow David C. Rose to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8864157) filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 11/29/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
7 7 motion Issuance of Summons Wed 11/13 4:12 PM
MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Romark Global Pharma, LLC filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 11/27/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
misc Notice of Docket Text Modification Tue 11/12 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re:4 Motion to allow David C. Rose to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8864157). ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong case number. To be corrected and re-filed.*** (idg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/22 10:00 AM
Motion to allow Jack W. Pirozzolo to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8864159) filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC.(idg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/22 9:55 AM
Motion to allow Lara Kasten Hoffman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8864158) filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC.(idg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/22 9:49 AM
Motion to allow David C. Rose to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8864157) filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC.(idg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 notice Notice of Filing Exhibits Tue 10/22 9:33 AM
**CASE PARTICIPANTS** NOTICE of Filing Exhibits: Exhibit B re1 MOTION requesting Order filed by Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC. (idg)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Restrict Tue 10/22 9:32 AM
MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC. (idg)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Requesting Order Tue 10/22 9:22 AM
PETITION for Confirmation of Arbitration Award filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC.(idg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Category Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 10/22 9:44 AM
Filing Fee Received $ 52.00, receipt number 114945. (idg)
Related: [-]